This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 03/08/2023 at 17:33:59 (UTC).

STATE OF OKLAHOMA V. KIMBERLY LOUISE DUNAGAN

Case Summary

On 02/21/2023 STATE OF OKLAHOMA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against KIMBERLY LOUISE DUNAGAN. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Pottawatomie, Oklahoma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0107

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Defendant

DUNAGAN, KIMBERLY LOUISE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GARDNER, JOHN

 

Court Documents

FILE BOND-JANUARY 29, 2023

02/21/2023: FILE BOND-JANUARY 29, 2023

FILE RELEASE REPORT 1-29-23 TO 1-29-23 $60

02/10/2023: FILE RELEASE REPORT 1-29-23 TO 1-29-23 $60

FILE COURT MINUTE-SET FOR 5-4-23 @ 1:30 PM $1,000.00

02/27/2023: FILE COURT MINUTE-SET FOR 5-4-23 @ 1:30 PM $1,000.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2023
  • HearingEvent: MISDEMEANOR DISPOSITION DOCKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: BOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE COURT MINUTE-SET FOR 5-4-23 @ 1:30 PM; $1,000.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTER AMOUNT OF BOND--$1,000.00; Amount: $ 3.75

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTER POWER #33284; Amount: $ 2.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTER BONDSMAN NAME--STEVEN DUTCHER; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE BOND-JANUARY 29, 2023; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE WARRANTLESS ARREST PROBABLE CAUSE STATEMENT; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ADDITIONAL RV FOR AFIS (NOV, 2017); Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ADDITIONAL RV FOR FORENSIC (NOV, 2017); Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DA COUNCIL PROSECUTION ASSESSMENT FOR DUI; Amount: $ 83.25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SHAWNEE POLICE DEPARTMENT; Amount: $ 83.25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE INFORMATION; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 166.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE RELEASE REPORT 1-29-23 TO 1-29-23 $60; Amount: $ 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less