This case was last updated from McIntosh County Courts on 05/27/2022 at 11:45:43 (UTC).

STATE OF OKLAHOMA V. JEFFREY KINSEY

Case Summary

On 01/07/2021 STATE OF OKLAHOMA filed an Other lawsuit against JEFFREY KINSEY. This case was filed in McIntosh County Courts, McIntosh County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIDGES, BRENDON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0046

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    McIntosh, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

BRIDGES, BRENDON

 

Party Details

Defendant

KINSEY, JEFFREY

Not Yet Classified

HARRIS, CANNON

GAME WARDEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

A.D.A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • HearingEvent: WILDLIFE INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 03-05-21 OR A WARRANT COULD BE ISSUED. CT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FOR HIM. HE WAS TOLD HE NEEDS TO PAY NO LATER THAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEFD CALLED STATED HE WILL HAVE SOMEONE IN TO MAKE PYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • HearingEvent: WILDLIFE INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PAY AND IT'S DIVIDED INTO 3 MONTHLY PYMTS. CT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: TO COME IN AND FILL OUT PAPERWORK AND HAS 90 DAYS TO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEFD CALLED STATED HE WANTS TO MAKE PYMTS. HE WAS TOLD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: INCIDENT STATEMENT; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 14.40

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CL10; Amount: $ 1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF AF10; Amount: $ 1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE TREASURERS FORENSIC FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FINE 10.00; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER CITATION; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 83.00

    Read MoreRead Less