This case was last updated from Kiowa County Courts on 08/02/2022 at 03:20:51 (UTC).

STATE OF OKLAHOMA V. ETHAN R ELLIS

Case Summary

On 12/07/2020 STATE OF OKLAHOMA filed an Other lawsuit against ETHAN R ELLIS. This case was filed in Kiowa County Courts, Kiowa County Courthouse located in Seminole, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is MARSH, RICKY A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0013

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Kiowa, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

MARSH, RICKY A.

 

Party Details

Defendant

ELLIS, ETHAN R

Not Yet Classified

PERKENS, DANIEL (552)

OKLA. DEPT. OF WILDLIFE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BLEW, WILLIAM B III

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSED AT REQUEST OF STATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • HearingEvent: COMPLETION OF DEFERRED SENTENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • HearingEvent: WILDLIFE APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • HearingEvent: PENDING DEFERRED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -14.40

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -3.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -3.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -17.60

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CL10; Amount: $ 1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF AFS1; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE TREASURERS FORENSIC FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AUTOMATED FINGERPRINTING INFORMATION SYSTEM; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 1/2 TO COUNTY GENERAL; Amount: $ 125.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FINE 250.00 1/2 TO WILDLIFE; Amount: $ 125.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CENTER FOR LAW ENFORCEMENT EDUCATION & TRAINING ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ARREST FEES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER CITATION; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 83.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less