This case was last updated from Rogers County Courts on 05/22/2022 at 06:06:56 (UTC).

State of Oklahoma v. Brewer, Tony Ray

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 State of Oklahoma filed an Other lawsuit against Brewer, Tony Ray. This case was filed in Rogers County Courts, Rogers County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Russell, Lara M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****22-1

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Rogers, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Russell, Lara M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF OKLAHOMA

Defendant

Brewer, Tony Ray

Not Yet Classified

Oklahoma Highway Patrol

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketCode: OTCAP; Description: NOTICE TO OKLAHOMA TAX COMMISSION WARRANT INTERCEPT - ADD CLAIM PROCESSED BY AOC; Party: Brewer, Tony Ray

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketCode: OTCAD; Description: NOTICE TO OKLAHOMA TAX COMMISSION WARRANT INTERCEPT - ADD CLAIM; Party: Brewer, Tony Ray

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • HearingEvent: INITIAL APPEARANCE (TRAFFIC); Party: Brewer,TonyRay; Docket: Lara M Russell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DispositionDisposition Information; Disposed: CONVICTION, ;. Nolo Contendere Plea; Count as Disposed: WILDLIFE VIOLATIONS(WL) Violation of 29 O.S. 7-201; Party Details; Brewer, Tony Ray

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketCode: PPA; Description: AMENDED ROGERS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT PAYMENT PLAN (STARTING 3-1-22 AT $50 A MONTH) PAY IN ORDER: CF-2015-722, WL-2022-1; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Party: Brewer, Tony Ray

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketCode: RULE8; Description: RULE 8 ORDER ON FINES & COSTS AND ORDER TO REPORT TO COST ADMINISTRATOR; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Party: Brewer, Tony Ray

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketCode: FINE; Description: FINES PAYABLE TO COUNTY; Count: 1; Party: Brewer, Tony Ray; Amount: $ 939.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketCode: WFINE; Description: DEPARTMENT OF WILDLIFE - FINES (AC15); Count: 1; Party: Brewer, Tony Ray; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE; Count: 1; Party: Brewer, Tony Ray; Amount: $ 14.40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COLLECTIONS; Count: 1; Party: Brewer, Tony Ray; Amount: $ 9.60

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketCode: MELRF; Description: MEDICAL EXPENSE LIABILITY REVOLVING FUND; Count: 1; Party: Brewer, Tony Ray; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Count: 1; Party: Brewer, Tony Ray; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketCode: DACPAM; Description: DA COUNCIL PROSECUTION ASSESSMENT FOR MISDEMEANOR; Count: 1; Party: Brewer, Tony Ray; Amount: $ 30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketCode: COSTM; Description: COURT COSTS ON MISDEMEANOR; Count: 1; Party: Brewer, Tony Ray; Amount: $ 83.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketCode: O; Description: RESTITUTION ORDER; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Party: Brewer, Tony Ray

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE RUSSELL; STATE BY WATERS; DEFT PRESENT, PRO SE. CASE COMES ON FOR ARRAIGNMENTS. DEFT SWORN; WAIVES JURY TRIAL. DEFT ENTERS PLEA-NO CONTEST. COURT ACCEPTS PLEA AND ORDERS: CT1) $939 FINE + CC COURT ORDERS DEFT TO CHECK IN WITH THE COURT CLERKS OFFICE TO SET UP PAYMENT PLAN. DEFT ADVISED OF RIGHT TO APPPEAL.; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Party: Brewer, Tony Ray

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE RUSSELL, LARA M TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OHP CITATION; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Party: Brewer, Tony Ray

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: WILDLIFE INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1; Party: Brewer, Tony Ray

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • DocketCount # 1.; Count as Filed: WL, WILDLIFE VIOLATIONS, in violation of 29 O.S. 7-201

    Read MoreRead Less