This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 10/04/2022 at 13:48:52 (UTC).

THE APPLICATION OF: THE STATE OF OKLA. EXREL-, CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS

Case Summary

On 09/27/2010 THE APPLICATION OF THE STATE OF OKLA EXREL-, CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS was filed as a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Pottawatomie, Oklahoma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0082

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2010

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE STATE OF OKLA. EXREL

Defendants

ONE (1) 1999 LINCOLN TOWN CAR

(1) 2002 CADILLAC ESCALADE EXT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SMOTHERMAN, RICHARD L. D.A.

 

Court Documents

FILE MOTION TO CONFIRM DISTRICT ATTORNEYS SALE

12/07/2017: FILE MOTION TO CONFIRM DISTRICT ATTORNEYS SALE

FILE ORDER SETTING HEARING - 1-3-18 AT 1.30PM

12/12/2017: FILE ORDER SETTING HEARING - 1-3-18 AT 1.30PM

FILE ORDER CONFIRMING SALE

01/04/2018: FILE ORDER CONFIRMING SALE

 

Docket Entries

01/04/2018

HearingEvent: ORDER CONFIRMING SALE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2018
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER CONFIRMING SALE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2018

HearingEvent: HEARING DATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2017
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER SETTING HEARING - 1-3-18 AT 1.30PM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2017
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE MOTION TO CONFIRM DISTRICT ATTORNEYS SALE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/25/2014

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE RETURN OF SERVICE BY REGISTERED MAIL; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2014

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2014

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE NOTICE OF SALE; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/12/2014

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SOLD ON 11-29-14 AT 10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/12/2014

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER THE PROPERTY LISTED IN PETITION SHALL BE; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2014

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SALE OF FORFEITED PROPERTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2014

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE NOTICE OF HEARING ON STATE'S PETITION TO CONDUCT; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2014

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION TO CONDUCT SALE OF FORFEITED PROPERTY; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2010

HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2010

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE JOURNAL ENTRY & ORDER OF FORFEITURE; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2010

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE RETURN OF SERVICE TO PCPSC 9-28-10; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2010

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE RETURN OF SERVICE TO UNITY NORTH 9-28-10; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2010

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE NOTICE OF SEIZURE AND FORFEITURE; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

[+] Read More [-] Read Less