This case was last updated from Beckham County Courts on 05/04/2022 at 06:44:47 (UTC).

YES FINANCE V. DEMICHAEL MARKETTE HUDDLEN

Case Summary

On 06/11/2018 YES FINANCE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DEMICHAEL MARKETTE HUDDLEN. This case was filed in Beckham County Courts, Beckham County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is ROPER, HONORABLE MICHELLE K.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0230

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Beckham, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

ROPER, HONORABLE MICHELLE K.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YES FINANCE

Defendant

HUDDLEN, DEMICHAEL MARKETTE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SIGNED BY: UNABLE TO READ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETURN RECEIPT OF CERTIFIED MAIL - DATED: 07-16-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CALCULATION OF GARNISHMENT: NOT EMPLOYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GARNISHEE'S ANSWER/AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 63.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • HearingEvent: ROPER-SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • HearingEvent: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JUDGMENT $288.60 PLUS COURT COST. MKR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PLAIN APPEARS; DEFT DOES NOT APPEAR. DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT ORDER MINUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFDIAVIT AND ORDER RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER ISSUED; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less