This case was last updated from Ottawa County Courts on 04/09/2022 at 19:33:35 (UTC).

WORLD FINANCE V. ROBERTO FRANCISCO

Case Summary

On 01/08/2021 WORLD FINANCE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ROBERTO FRANCISCO. This case was filed in Ottawa County Courts, Ottawa County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is BAIRD, BECKY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0008

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Ottawa, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

BAIRD, BECKY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WORLD FINANCE

Defendant

FRANCISCO, ROBERTO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • HearingEvent: NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: BEGINNING 3-1-2021 UNTIL THE JUDGMENT IS PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEFENDANT TO PAY $200 PER MONTH TO THE PLAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OF $812.15 + $68 CC + $50 PS. COURT ORDERS THE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CONFESSES JUDGMENT. COURT GRANTS JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SWORN IN. CASE COMES ON FOR MONEY JUDGMENT. DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM BRB: PLAIN PRESENT, DEFENDANT PRESENT. PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, DEFT SVD 1-26-21, $50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ALIAS AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MAILING FEE FOR RETURN OF JOURNAL ENTRY; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM W/ORDER; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less