This case was last updated from Okmulgee County Courts on 04/09/2022 at 13:47:54 (UTC).

WORLD FINANCE CORP. V. CYNTHIA ROBISON-HEANEY

Case Summary

On 08/09/2018 WORLD FINANCE CORP filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against CYNTHIA ROBISON-HEANEY. This case was filed in Okmulgee County Courts, Okmulgee County Courthouse - Okmulgee Division located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is PICKERING, CYNTHIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0571

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Okmulgee, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

PICKERING, CYNTHIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WORLD FINANCE CORP.

Defendant

ROBISON-HEANEY, CYNTHIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GARNISHEE'S ANSWER ($238.77)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GARNISHEE'S ANSWER ($273.05)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GARNISHEE'S ANSWER ($287.61)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GARNISHEE'S ANSWER: NO LONGER EMPLOYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GREEN CARD RET'D FILED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CONTINUING POSTJUDGMENT EARNINGS GARNISHMENT SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV FUN; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK REV FUND; Amount: $ 0.66

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REV FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CONTINUING GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT/MAILING; Amount: $ 73.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • HearingEvent: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT MINUTE: PICKERING: DEFAULT JUDGMENT ($1145.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: BY PPS DUKE TO CYNTHIA HEONEY $50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETURN OF SERVICE BY SPECIAL OFFICER, RET. FILED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT ISSUED TO CYNTHIA HEONEY: PPS DUKE; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less