This case was last updated from Cherokee County Courts on 07/17/2021 at 21:35:07 (UTC).

WORLD FINANCE CORP. V. ANGELA CHUCULATE

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 WORLD FINANCE CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ANGELA CHUCULATE. This case was filed in Cherokee County Courts, Cherokee County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is HUGGINS, GARY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0549

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Cherokee, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

HUGGINS, GARY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WORLD FINANCE CORP.

Defendant

CHUCULATE, ANGELA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketDescription: PROOF OF SERVICE FROM USPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketDescription: GARNISHEE'S ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketDescription: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketDescription: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketDescription: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketDescription: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketDescription: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketDescription: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketDescription: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketDescription: CONTINUING GARNISHEE SUMMONS ISSUED CERT MAIL; Amount: $ 20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketDescription: GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 63.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • HearingEvent: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketDescription: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketDescription: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketDescription: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketDescription: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketDescription: ISSUE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM W/ORDER DIRECT; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less