This case was last updated from Woodward County Courts on 06/03/2022 at 05:52:11 (UTC).

WOODWARD HEALTH SYSTEM LLC V. BILLY DEAN NOSLER

Case Summary

On 06/24/2021 WOODWARD HEALTH SYSTEM LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BILLY DEAN NOSLER. This case was filed in Woodward County Courts, Woodward County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is KIRKSEY, ERIN N. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0190

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Woodward, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

KIRKSEY, ERIN N

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WOODWARD HEALTH SYSTEM LLC

Defendant

NOSLER, BILLY DEAN

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR MONEY DUE ON ACCOUNT LESS THAN $10,000

06/24/2021: PETITION FOR MONEY DUE ON ACCOUNT LESS THAN $10,000

ORDER (UNTIL 3/24/22 TO PERFECT SERVICE)

01/05/2022: ORDER (UNTIL 3/24/22 TO PERFECT SERVICE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER (UNTIL 3/24/22 TO PERFECT SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ALIAS SUMMONS & WWSO RETURN/NOT FOUND/COPY TO PLF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SERVICE BY SHERIFF-WWSO; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PERFECT SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ALIAS SUMMONS & WWSO RETURN/NOT FOUND/COPY TO P'S ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SERVICE BY SHERIFF-WWSO; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION FOR MONEY DUE ON ACCOUNT LESS THAN $10,000; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less