This case was last updated from Kay County Courts on 04/29/2022 at 07:47:56 (UTC).

WIN-CO FINANCE V. STEPHEN TOLLAND, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 WIN-CO FINANCE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STEPHEN TOLLAND. This case was filed in Kay County Courts, Kay County Courthouse - Newkirk Division located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is WILKIE, DAVID M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0289

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Kay, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

WILKIE, DAVID M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WIN-CO FINANCE

Defendants

TOLLAND, STEPHEN

TOLLAND, STEPHANIE

 

Court Documents

JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

06/23/2021: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2027
  • HearingEvent: DESTRUCTION REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • HearingEvent: SHOW CAUSE HEARING-SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AND JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $1,023.62, ALL AS PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JUDGMENT TO PLAIN AGAINST DEFENDANTS FOR THE COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APPEARS. DEFENDANTS FAIL TO APPEAR. COURT GRANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CAUSE COMES ON FOR HEARING ON SMALL CLAIMS. PLAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM:WILKIE MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 7, 2021 BY PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: TOLLAND/STEPHANIE TOLLAND BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON JUNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETURN OF AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER SERVED: STEPHEN; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER ISSUED TO ATTY FOR SERVICE; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less