This case was last updated from Garfield County Courts on 06/25/2022 at 07:50:53 (UTC).

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, AS TRUSTEE OF STANWICH MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST I Plaintiff, vs. MELISSA KAY HOLDEMAN, SPOUSE OF MELISSA KAY HOLDEMAN, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, AS TRUSTEE OF STANWICH MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST I Plaintiff filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MELISSA KAY HOLDEMAN, SPOUSE OF MELISSA KAY HOLDEMAN, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE, Defendant s. This case was filed in Garfield County Courts, Garfield County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Newby, Tom. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-11

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Garfield, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Newby, Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB

Defendant

HOLDEMAN, MELISSA K

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TIMBERLAKE, DON

Attorney at BAER, TIMBERLAKE, COULSON AND CATES, PC.

Po Box 18486

Oklahoma City, OK 73154

 

Court Documents

PETITION

01/19/2022: PETITION

SUMMONS ISSUED - PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

01/19/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED - PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

01/19/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED - PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

01/19/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED - PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

01/19/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

03/11/2022: NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

03/11/2022: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: SPOUSE OF MELISSA HOLDEMAN

04/11/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: SPOUSE OF MELISSA HOLDEMAN

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: MELISSA HOLDEMAN

04/11/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: MELISSA HOLDEMAN

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: JANE DOE THROUGH TIM BEEBE 1/27/22

04/11/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: JANE DOE THROUGH TIM BEEBE 1/27/22

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: JOHN DOE PERSONALLY (TIM BEEBE) 1/27/22

04/11/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: JOHN DOE PERSONALLY (TIM BEEBE) 1/27/22

PROOF OF PUBLICATION - 202931

05/12/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION - 202931

PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

06/06/2022: PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

06/06/2022: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

06/16/2022: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

NOTICE OF HEARING - MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT ON 7-11-22 AT 9AM

06/16/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING - MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT ON 7-11-22 AT 9AM

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2022
  • HearingEvent: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Docket: Tom Newby

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • HearingEvent: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Docket: Tom Newby

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOH; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING - MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT ON 7-11-22 AT 9AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CM; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: ANMS; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MODJ; Description: PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PP; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION - 202931

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMS; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: JOHN DOE PERSONALLY (TIM BEEBE) 1/27/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMS; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: JANE DOE THROUGH TIM BEEBE 1/27/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMU; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: MELISSA HOLDEMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCode: FORE; Description: FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF MORE THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: FORECLOSURE(FORE); Filed By: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TIMBERLAKE, DON