This case was last updated from Garfield County Courts on 07/02/2022 at 10:58:40 (UTC).

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, AS TRUSTEE OF STANWICH MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST I Plaintiff, v. MELISSA KAY HOLDEMAN, SPOUSE OF MELISSA KAY HOLDEMAN, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE, Defendants.

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, AS TRUSTEE OF STANWICH MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST I Plaintiff filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MELISSA KAY HOLDEMAN, SPOUSE OF MELISSA KAY HOLDEMAN, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE, Defendants. This case was filed in Garfield County Courts, Garfield County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Hladik, Dennis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****22-8

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Garfield, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Hladik, Dennis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB

Defendant

HOLDEMAN, MELISSA K

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TIMBERLAKE, DON

Attorney at BAER, TIMBERLAKE, COULSON AND CATES, PC.

Po Box 18486

Oklahoma City, OK 73154

Defendant Attorney

SINGLETON, RUSSELL

201 N. Grand, Suite 400

Enid, OK 73701

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: JANE DOE SERVED - POSTED 5/31/22

06/23/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: JANE DOE SERVED - POSTED 5/31/22

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS MAIL AND POSTING

06/23/2022: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS MAIL AND POSTING

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: JOHN DOE SERVED - POSTED 5/31/22

06/23/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: JOHN DOE SERVED - POSTED 5/31/22

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE - RUSSELL SINGLETON FOR DEFENDANT

05/20/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE - RUSSELL SINGLETON FOR DEFENDANT

SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY - JANE DOE

05/16/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY - JANE DOE

SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY - JOHN DOE

05/16/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY - JOHN DOE

AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION - 25804

05/11/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION - 25804

ORDER AUTHORIZING SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS MAIL AND POSTING

04/27/2022: ORDER AUTHORIZING SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS MAIL AND POSTING

MOTION FOR SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS MAIL AND POSTING

04/18/2022: MOTION FOR SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS MAIL AND POSTING

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: MELISSA HOLDEMAN

04/11/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: MELISSA HOLDEMAN

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: SPOUSE OF MELISSA HOLDEMAN

04/11/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: SPOUSE OF MELISSA HOLDEMAN

NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

04/08/2022: NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

04/08/2022: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

SUMMONS ISSUED - PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

01/18/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED - PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

01/18/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED - PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

01/18/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED - PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

01/18/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

PETITION

01/18/2022: PETITION

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMS; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: JANE DOE SERVED - POSTED 5/31/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CER; Description: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS MAIL AND POSTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMS; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: JOHN DOE SERVED - POSTED 5/31/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: EAA; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE - RUSSELL SINGLETON FOR DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2022-518901 ON 05/16/2022. PAYOR: BAER & TIMBERLAKE TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 20.00. LINE ITEMS: CJ-2022-8: $20.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMIMA; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY - JANE DOE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMIMA; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY - JOHN DOE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketCode: SMF; Description: SUMMONS FEE X2; Amount: $ 20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PP; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION - 25804

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER AUTHORIZING SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS MAIL AND POSTING

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: FORE; Description: FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF MORE THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: FORECLOSURE(FORE); Filed By: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TIMBERLAKE, DON