This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 02/20/2023 at 11:29:46 (UTC).

WILLOW GROUP LLC V. OCCUPANTS, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 WILLOW GROUP LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against OCCUPANTS,. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Tulsa, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is MUELLER, EMILY J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0050

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

MUELLER, EMILY J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLOW GROUP LLC

Defendants

BOND, BREANA

OCCUPANTS

 

Court Documents

FILE AFFIDAVIT & ISSUE NOTICE + SUMMONS

01/12/2023: FILE AFFIDAVIT & ISSUE NOTICE + SUMMONS

FILE AMENDED AFFIDAVIT

01/23/2023: FILE AMENDED AFFIDAVIT

FILE CM: COURTHOUSE CLOSED DUE TO WEATHER. AMENDED PET

01/26/2023: FILE CM: COURTHOUSE CLOSED DUE TO WEATHER. AMENDED PET

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TO BREANA BOND 1-23-23

01/26/2023: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TO BREANA BOND 1-23-23

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPNTS BY

01/26/2023: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPNTS BY

FILE CM: JUDGMENT FOR PLF OF $3000.00 AND POSSESSION

02/01/2023: FILE CM: JUDGMENT FOR PLF OF $3000.00 AND POSSESSION

FILE JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

02/01/2023: FILE JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

02/22/2023

HearingEvent: FORCIBLE ENTRY AND DETAINER DOCKET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2023

HearingEvent: FORCIBLE ENTRY AND DETAINER DOCKET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2023

HearingEvent: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2023

HearingEvent: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AND ALL COST. HRG ON DAMAGES SET 2-22-23 AT 10:00AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE CM: JUDGMENT FOR PLF OF $3000.00 AND POSSESSION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE STATUS REPORT OF MILITARY SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: BREANA BOND 1-23-23

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPNTS BY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
01/23/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE SUMMONS; Amount: $ 10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AMENDED AFFIDAVIT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 1.45

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.17

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.15

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: MONIES DUE THE FOLLOWING AGENCY(IES) REDUCED; Amount: $ -1.13

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT & ISSUE NOTICE + SUMMONS; Amount: $ 45.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less