This case was last updated from Ottawa County Courts on 04/05/2022 at 09:21:14 (UTC).

WILLIAM DARYLE BAUMANN, ET. AL. V. DANIEL ROWE, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 06/25/2018 WILLIAM DARYLE BAUMANN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DANIEL ROWE. This case was filed in Ottawa County Courts, Ottawa County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CULVER, BILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0281

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Ottawa, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CULVER, BILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BAUMANN, WILLIAM DARYLE

BAUMANN, BOBBI

Defendants

ROWE, DANIEL

BIBLE, HEATHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BEAUCHAMP, KAY LYN

524 South Main Street, P.O. Box 451987

Grove, OK 74345

PEWITT, DOUGLAS SCOTT

Attorney at PEWITT LAW OFFICE

105 1St Ave Ne

Miami, OK 74354

 

Court Documents

CM BC: MATTER COMES ON FOR DAMAGES: DUE TO FAMILY

09/10/2018: CM BC: MATTER COMES ON FOR DAMAGES: DUE TO FAMILY

CM BC: PLAIN PRESENT, DEFENDANT (DANIEL ROWE)

10/08/2019: CM BC: PLAIN PRESENT, DEFENDANT (DANIEL ROWE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: BENCH WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • HearingEvent: BENCH WARRANT ISSUED M.T.R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: BENCH WARRANT ISSUED; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MOTION TO REVOKE SUSPENDED SENTENCE ON CONTEMPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CLERKS OFFICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: $50 FILING FEE FOR THE BENCH WARRANT WITH THE COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: BENCH WARRANT, PLAINTIF ADVISED BY THE COURT TO PAY THE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT GRANTS MOTION TO REVOKE ON CONTEMPT, COURT ORDERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATUS, PLAIN REQUEST MOTION TO REVOKE TO BE FILED,

    Read MoreRead Less
102 More Docket Entries
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM BC: PLAIN S APPEAR, DEFENDANTS APPEAR, PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, SVD 6-27-18 TO DFT, $40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 1.70

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: MONIES DUE THE FOLLOWING AGENCY(IES) REDUCED; Amount: $ -1.38

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MAILING FEE FOR JOURNAL ENTRY; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM W/ORDER; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less