This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 04/08/2022 at 22:56:03 (UTC).

B.B., ET. AL. V. PROGESSIVE DIRECT INS. CO., ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 B B filed an Other lawsuit against PROGESSIVE DIRECT INS CO . This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Seminole County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is OLSEN, HONORABLE TIMOTHY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0053

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

OLSEN, HONORABLE TIMOTHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BATES, WILLIAM

MEEK, TERRA

B.B.

Defendants

PROGESSIVE DIRECT INS. CO.

WALKER, FAITH DIANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ROBERSON, BRAD L.

119 North Robinson Avenue

Okc, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

PETITION

07/12/2021: PETITION

JOINT APPLICATION FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND

07/12/2021: JOINT APPLICATION FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND

ORDER SETTING HEARING

07/26/2021: ORDER SETTING HEARING

ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND UNDERINSURED MOTORIST

09/21/2021: ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND UNDERINSURED MOTORIST

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER AUTHORIZING WITHDRAWAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: VERIFICATION OF RECEIPT AND DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • HearingEvent: NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PLAIN S' DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER TO PROVIDE PROOF OF DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISTRIBUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND UNDERINSURED MOTORIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING - OLSEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, FAITH DIANNE WALKER

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less