This case was last updated from Canadian County Courts on 01/14/2022 at 18:30:03 (UTC).

WESTERN FARMERS ELECTRIC COOPERATIVE OF ANADARKO OKLAHOMA, A CORPORATION, Plaintiff, v. WILKERSON FAMILY PARTNERSHIP, AN OKLAHOMA CORPORATION, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 07/11/2018 WESTERN FARMERS ELECTRIC COOPERATIVE OF ANADARKO OKLAHOMA, A CORPORATION, Plaintiff filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against WILKERSON FAMILY PARTNERSHIP, AN OKLAHOMA CORPORATION, Defendant. This case was filed in Canadian County Courts, Canadian County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Hesse, Paul. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-397

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Canadian, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Hesse, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTERN FARMERS ELECTRIC COOPERATIVE OF ANADARKO OKLAHOMA

Defendant

WILKERSON FAMILY PARTNERSHIP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GARLAND, JOHN W

111 Sw 2Nd St.Po Box 158

Anadarko, OK 73005

HOBBS, BRIAN W

111 Sw 2Ndpo Box 158

Anadarko, OK 73005

Defendant Attorneys

WILLOUGHBY, MATTHEW

1329 Classen Drive

Oklahoma City, OK 73103

WOODSON, MICHAEL

7 S. Mickey Mantle Drive, Second Floor

Oklahoma City, OK 73104

 

Court Documents

REPORT OF COMMISSIONERS FILED

10/09/2018: REPORT OF COMMISSIONERS FILED

MOTION FOR ORDER OF ENTRY FILED

02/13/2019: MOTION FOR ORDER OF ENTRY FILED

AMENDED NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION FILED

08/01/2018: AMENDED NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION FILED

INSTRUCTIONS TO COMMISSIONERS FILED

09/10/2018: INSTRUCTIONS TO COMMISSIONERS FILED

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING VOUCHER FILED

12/11/2018: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING VOUCHER FILED

NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION PROCEEDING FILED

11/06/2018: NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION PROCEEDING FILED

DEFENDANT WILKERSONS PARTNERSHIPS MOTION TO COMPEL PLAIN S RESPONSE TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY FILED NO COPY FOR JUDGE

05/06/2019: DEFENDANT WILKERSONS PARTNERSHIPS MOTION TO COMPEL PLAIN S RESPONSE TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY FILED NO COPY FOR JUDGE

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FILED

06/06/2019: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FILED

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED

07/11/2018: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketCode: DISBURSED; Description: VOUCHER# 15767 PRINTED TO WESTERN FARMERS ELECTRIC COOPERATIVE OF A, WHICH INCLUDES $ 208,846.00 FROM THIS CASE FOR AC51 - COMMISSIONERS AWARD RECEIVED - CIVIL ONLY. TOTAL AMOUNT OF VOUCHER: $ 208,846.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: REQUESTED VOUCHER IN AMOUNT OF 208,846.00 TO WESTERN FARMERS ELECTRIC COOPERATIVE OF ANADARKO OKLAHOMA FROM ACCOUNT AC51. DISBURSEMENT NUMBER 2748006.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: JUDGEMENT ENTERED; Judge; Party Details; Plaintiff: WESTERN FARMERS ELECTRIC COOPERATIVE OF ANADARKO OKLAHOMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: REL; Description: RELEASE OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED; Party: WESTERN FARMERS ELECTRIC COOPERATIVE OF ANADARKO OKLAHOMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: JE; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY FILED; Party: WESTERN FARMERS ELECTRIC COOPERATIVE OF ANADARKO OKLAHOMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: EAA; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FILED; Party: WESTERN FARMERS ELECTRIC COOPERATIVE OF ANADARKO OKLAHOMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • HearingEvent: MOTION TO COMPEL; Party: WILKERSON FAMILY PARTNERSHIP; Docket: Paul Hesse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: CRT MIN. THE MOTION TO COMPEL SET 06-14-19 IS MOOT. JUDGE PAUL HESSE (BY MARY HICKS, SEC./BAILIFF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: EAA; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FILED; Party: WESTERN FARMERS ELECTRIC COOPERATIVE OF ANADARKO OKLAHOMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MOC; Description: DEFENDANT WILKERSONS PARTNERSHIPS MOTION TO COMPEL PLAIN S RESPONSE TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY FILED NO COPY FOR JUDGE; Party: WILKERSON FAMILY PARTNERSHIP

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketCode: CONDEMN; Description: CONDEMNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF MORE THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING. // PETITION FILED; Count: 1; Party: WESTERN FARMERS ELECTRIC COOPERATIVE OF ANADARKO OKLAHOMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: CONDEMNATION(CONDEMN); Filed By: WESTERN FARMERS ELECTRIC COOPERATIVE OF ANADARKO OKLAHOMA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WOODSON, MICHAEL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLOUGHBY, MATTHEW