This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 11/12/2022 at 02:36:57 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, NA V. UNITED STATE OF AMERICA EXREL, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 06/07/2018 WELLS FARGO BANK, NA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against UNITED STATE OF AMERICA EXREL,. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Pottawatomie, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0218

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK, NA

Defendants

PERMETTER, ELIZABETH

PERMETTER, KEYON

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATI ON

UNITED STATE OF AMERICA EXREL

OCCUPANT 1

OCCUPANT 2

 

Court Documents

FILE RETURN OF SERVICE - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA EX

07/11/2018: FILE RETURN OF SERVICE - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA EX

FILE PETITION (OVER $10,000.)

06/07/2018: FILE PETITION (OVER $10,000.)

FILE FINAL JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, FINDINGS OF FACT,

09/13/2018: FILE FINAL JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, FINDINGS OF FACT,

FILE AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

09/06/2018: FILE AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

FILE APPLICATION TO VACATE JUDGMENT, RESTORE NOTE AND

11/14/2018: FILE APPLICATION TO VACATE JUDGMENT, RESTORE NOTE AND

FILE CERTIFICATION BY PLAIN AND MOTION FOR DEFAULT

09/06/2018: FILE CERTIFICATION BY PLAIN AND MOTION FOR DEFAULT

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC

07/12/2018: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC

FILE RETURN OF SERVICE - OCCUPANT 1 & 2 NOT SERVED,

07/11/2018: FILE RETURN OF SERVICE - OCCUPANT 1 & 2 NOT SERVED,

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/26/2018
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2018
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2018

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2018

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2018

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2018

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2018

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2018

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2018

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2018

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MORTGAGE FOR DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
06/07/2018

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2018

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2018

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2018

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2018

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2018

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2018

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2018

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2018

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2018
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION (OVER $10,000.); Amount: $ 163.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less