This case was last updated from Jackson County Courts on 05/15/2022 at 12:49:56 (UTC).

WALDROOP STEEL, LLC V. 3C UTILITIES, LLC AND JAMES COX

Case Summary

On 09/08/2021 WALDROOP STEEL, LLC filed a Property - Repossession lawsuit against 3C UTILITIES, LLC AND JAMES COX. This case was filed in Jackson County Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is HUEY, CLARK E.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0079

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Repossession

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

HUEY, CLARK E.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALDROOP STEEL, LLC

Defendant

3C UTILITIES, LLC AND JAMES COX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

STUCK, NILES

2524 N. Broadway

Edmond, OK 73034

 

Court Documents

ORDER RESTRAINING DISPOSITION OF SPECIFIC PROPERTY

09/13/2021: ORDER RESTRAINING DISPOSITION OF SPECIFIC PROPERTY

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND RESERVATION OF TIME

09/28/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND RESERVATION OF TIME

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ANSWER, AFFIRMATION DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND RESERVATION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER RESTRAINING DISPOSITION OF SPECIFIC PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (RETURNED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE SUMMONS; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (RETURNED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE SUMMONS; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OF PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SPECIFIC PROPERTY AND FOR ORDER RESTRAINING DISPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION AND APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR DELIVER OF; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STUCK, NILES