This case was last updated from Choctaw County Courts on 06/21/2022 at 02:34:58 (UTC).

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC V. DEBRA LEE ROBERTS

Case Summary

On 10/21/2021 VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DEBRA LEE ROBERTS. This case was filed in Choctaw County Courts, Choctaw County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is DEBERRY, MICHAEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0041

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Choctaw, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

DEBERRY, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC

Defendant

ROBERTS, DEBRA LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GUBBINS, JASON P.

Attorney at FABER AND BRAND

P.O. Box 10110

Columbia, MO 65205

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/21/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2022
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CHSC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AND ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GUBBINS, JASON P