This case was last updated from Oklahoma County Courts on 05/07/2022 at 18:44:57 (UTC).

U.S. Bank National Association, Plaintiff, v. Norberto Villalta, SPOUSE OF Norberto Villalta, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 03/08/2022 U S Bank National Association, Plaintiff filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Norberto Villalta, SPOUSE OF Norberto Villalta, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, Defendant. This case was filed in Oklahoma County Courts, Oklahoma County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Bonner, Anthony L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1052

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Oklahoma, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Bonner, Anthony L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. Bank National Association

Defendant

Villalta, Norberto

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pogue Jenkins, Kim

Attorney at BAER & TIMBERLAKE PC

5901 N. Western, Suite 300

Oklahoma City, OK 73118

 

Court Documents

PETITION

03/08/2022: PETITION

PROOF OF PUBLICATION--JOURNAL RECORD--ORDER #12109871--PUBLISHER'S FEE $128.57--PAID DIRECT

04/29/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION--JOURNAL RECORD--ORDER #12109871--PUBLISHER'S FEE $128.57--PAID DIRECT

NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

04/13/2022: NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

04/13/2022: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: NOBERTO VILLALTA NOT FOUND

04/14/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: NOBERTO VILLALTA NOT FOUND

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: SPOUSE OF NORBERTO VILLALTA, IF ANY NOT FOUND

04/14/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: SPOUSE OF NORBERTO VILLALTA, IF ANY NOT FOUND

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: JOHN DOE (AKA MELVIN VILLALTA) BY LEAVING COPY WITH KAREN MELGAR ON 3/18/22

04/14/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: JOHN DOE (AKA MELVIN VILLALTA) BY LEAVING COPY WITH KAREN MELGAR ON 3/18/22

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: JANE DOE (AKA KAREN MELGAR) BY PERS. SERV. ON 3/18/22

04/14/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: JANE DOE (AKA KAREN MELGAR) BY PERS. SERV. ON 3/18/22

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PP; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION--JOURNAL RECORD--ORDER #12109871--PUBLISHER'S FEE $128.57--PAID DIRECT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMS; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: JANE DOE (AKA KAREN MELGAR) BY PERS. SERV. ON 3/18/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMS; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: JOHN DOE (AKA MELVIN VILLALTA) BY LEAVING COPY WITH KAREN MELGAR ON 3/18/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMU; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: SPOUSE OF NORBERTO VILLALTA, IF ANY NOT FOUND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMU; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: NOBERTO VILLALTA NOT FOUND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOPUB; Description: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOPUB; Description: NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2022-5155499 ON 03/08/2022. PAYOR: BAER & TIMBERLAKE, P.C. TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 282.14. LINE ITEMS: CJ-2022-1052: $203.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CJ-2022-1052: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. CJ-2022-1052: $1.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2022-1052: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CJ-2022-1052: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2022-1052: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY. CJ-2022-1052: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CJ-2022-1052: $2.48 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2022-1052: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2022-1052: $10.00 ON AC81 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND. CJ-2022-1052: $10.00 ON AC88 SHERIFFS SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY. CJ-2022-1052: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE BONNER, ANTHONY L. TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: P; Description: PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketCode: FORE; Description: FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF MORE THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: FORECLOSURE(FORE); Filed By: U.S. Bank National Association; Disposed: Pending.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pogue Jenkins, Kim