This case was last updated from Rogers County Courts on 01/17/2023 at 05:03:59 (UTC).

Us Bank National Assocation VS Dyer, T J Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 Us Bank National Assocation filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Dyer, T J. This case was filed in Rogers County Courts, Rogers County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Condren, Sheila A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0-35

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Rogers, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Condren, Sheila A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Us Bank National Assocation

Defendants

Steward, David James

Dyer, T J

Unknown Successors

Inman, Brenda

Lofgren, Jack

Steward, Seire

Lofgren, Victoria

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Baer, Gary D

Attorney at BAER & TIMBERLAKE, P.C.

4200 Perimeter Center Drive, Suite 100

Oklahoma City, OK 73112

 

Court Documents

NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

05/20/2020: NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

FINAL JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

08/19/2020: FINAL JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

07/29/2020: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

08/28/2020: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

06/29/2020: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, ANSWER AND DISCLAIMER

06/11/2020: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, ANSWER AND DISCLAIMER

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2021-643531 ON 06/09/2021. PAYOR: TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 0.00. LINE ITEMS: CJ-2020-35: $20.00 ON TRANSFER TO AC01 CLERK FEES. CJ-2020-35: $-20.00 ON TRANSFER FROM AC99 HOLDING.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CM; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: JUDGEMENT ENTERED; Judge; Party Details

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: JEJ; Description: FINAL JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC AND ORDER CONFORMING PLEADINGS TO CONFORM TO THE PROOF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: APLI; Description: APPLICATION FOR ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC AND APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONFORMING PLEADINGS TO CONFORM TO THE PROOF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: JUDGEMENT ENTERED; Judge; Party Details

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: JEJ; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PP; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISCLAIMER;; Party Details; Defendant: Dyer, T J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: FORE; Description: FORECLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF MORE THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: FORECLOSURE(FORE); Filed By: Us Bank National Assocation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less