This case was last updated from Logan County Courts on 03/30/2022 at 14:13:56 (UTC).

Unifund CCR, LLC v. Cody W Stout

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 Unifund CCR, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Cody W Stout. This case was filed in Logan County Courts, Logan County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Duel, Louis A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-165

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Logan, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Duel, Louis A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Unifund CCR, LLC

Defendant

Stout, Cody W

Garnishee

Dolese Bros

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Muller, David

Attorney at Love, Beal & Nixon PC

Po Box 32738

Oklahoma City, OK 73123

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR INDEBTEDNESS

06/10/2021: PETITION FOR INDEBTEDNESS

SUMMONS ISSUED BACK TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON CODY W STOUT

06/10/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED BACK TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON CODY W STOUT

SUMMONS RETURNED / PROOF OF SERVICE - SERVED CODY STOUT BY LEAVING COPY WITH DUNCAN STOUT ON 6-17-21

06/25/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED / PROOF OF SERVICE - SERVED CODY STOUT BY LEAVING COPY WITH DUNCAN STOUT ON 6-17-21

AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SERVICE

07/08/2021: AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SERVICE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

07/30/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

07/30/2021: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

08/23/2021: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT

10/14/2021: GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT

CONTINUING POSTJUDGMENT EARNINGS AND GARNISHMEN TSUMMONS ISSUED BACK TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON DOLESE BROS / NOTICE TO EMPLOYER / EMPLOYER'S ANSWER / CLAIM FOR EXEMPTION INFORMATION / CALCULATION FOR GARNISHMENT OF EARNINGS / CLAIM FOR EXEMPTION AND

10/14/2021: CONTINUING POSTJUDGMENT EARNINGS AND GARNISHMEN TSUMMONS ISSUED BACK TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON DOLESE BROS / NOTICE TO EMPLOYER / EMPLOYER'S ANSWER / CLAIM FOR EXEMPTION INFORMATION / CALCULATION FOR GARNISHMENT OF EARNINGS / CLAIM FOR EXEMPTION AND REQUEST FOR HEARING / NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT AND EXEMPTIONS

EMPLOYER'S ANSWER / CLAIM FOR EXEMPTION INFORMATION

11/22/2021: EMPLOYER'S ANSWER / CLAIM FOR EXEMPTION INFORMATION

RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIEN AND RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

01/25/2022: RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIEN AND RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED - RELEASE AND SATISFIED; Other; Party Details; Defendant: Stout, Cody W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RSJ; Description: RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIEN AND RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Party: Unifund CCR, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: ATG; Description: EMPLOYER'S ANSWER / CLAIM FOR EXEMPTION INFORMATION; Party: Dolese Bros

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2021-280129 ON 10/14/2021. PAYOR: EZ MESSENGER TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 116.64. LINE ITEMS: CS-2021-165: $73.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES FOR UNIFUND CCR, LLC. CS-2021-165: $0.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND FOR UNIFUND CCR, LLC. CS-2021-165: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES FOR UNIFUND CCR, LLC. CS-2021-165: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND FOR UNIFUND CCR, LLC. CS-2021-165: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS FOR UNIFUND CCR, LLC. CS-2021-165: $0.98 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND FOR UNIFUND CCR, LLC. CS-2021-165: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND FOR UNIFUND CCR, LLC. CS-2021-165: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE FOR UNIFUND CCR, LLC.; Party: Unifund CCR, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: GSIMA; Description: CONTINUING POSTJUDGMENT EARNINGS AND GARNISHMEN TSUMMONS ISSUED BACK TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON DOLESE BROS / NOTICE TO EMPLOYER / EMPLOYER'S ANSWER / CLAIM FOR EXEMPTION INFORMATION / CALCULATION FOR GARNISHMENT OF EARNINGS / CLAIM FOR EXEMPTION AND REQUEST FOR HEARING / NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT AND EXEMPTIONS; Party: Unifund CCR, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN04; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COLLECTIONS; Party: Unifund CCR, LLC; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCode: CCRMPF; Description: COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE; Party: Unifund CCR, LLC; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN05; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $5 COLLECTIONS; Party: Unifund CCR, LLC; Amount: $ 0.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN155; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $1.55 COLLECTIONS; Party: Unifund CCR, LLC; Amount: $ 0.23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCode: SJFIS; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND - INTERPRETER AND TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Party: Unifund CCR, LLC; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION FOR INDEBTEDNESS; Count: 1; Party: Unifund CCR, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT); Filed By: Unifund CCR, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less