This case was last updated from Adair County Courts on 05/13/2022 at 01:53:09 (UTC).

TULSA TEACHERS CREDIT UNION, Plaintiff, v. MELISSA DAWN JOHNSON and TROY DEAN SANDERS, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 07/30/2018 TULSA TEACHERS CREDIT UNION, Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MELISSA DAWN JOHNSON and TROY DEAN SANDERS, Defendant. This case was filed in Adair County Courts, Adair County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Payton, J. Jeffrey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8-36

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Adair, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Payton, J. Jeffrey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TULSA TEACHERS CREDIT UNION

Defendants

JOHNSON, MELISSA DAWN

SANDERS, TROY DEAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HINDS, COLLIN M.

1611 South Denver Avenue

Tulsa, OK 74119

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR COLLECTION OF INDEBTEDNESS

07/30/2018: PETITION FOR COLLECTION OF INDEBTEDNESS

SUMMONS FEE MELISSA JOHNSON

07/30/2018: SUMMONS FEE MELISSA JOHNSON

SUMMONS FEE TROY SANDERS

07/30/2018: SUMMONS FEE TROY SANDERS

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: FRED STOPP 11-26-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE ATTACHED

12/17/2018: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: FRED STOPP 11-26-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE ATTACHED

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: FRED STOPP 11-26-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE ATTACHED

12/17/2018: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: FRED STOPP 11-26-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE ATTACHED

JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

01/09/2019: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

01/09/2019: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/14/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS - CONTINUING WAGE

02/05/2019: GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS - CONTINUING WAGE

GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED MAILED BY PLAIN OR ATTORNEY

02/05/2019: GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED MAILED BY PLAIN OR ATTORNEY

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2019-118797 ON 02/05/2019. PAYOR: TTCU TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 106.64. LINE ITEMS: CJ-2018-36: $73.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CJ-2018-36: $0.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2018-36: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CJ-2018-36: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2018-36: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CJ-2018-36: $0.98 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2018-36: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: GSIMA; Description: GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED MAILED BY PLAIN OR ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN04; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN05; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $5 COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN155; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $1.55 COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketCode: SJFIS; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND - INTERPRETER AND TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN0155; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $1.55 COLLECTION; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION FOR COLLECTION OF INDEBTEDNESS; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF MORE THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT); Filed By: TULSA TEACHERS CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less