This case was last updated from Cherokee County Courts on 04/14/2022 at 01:41:50 (UTC).

TULSA ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC. V. JOHN RICHEY, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 06/01/2021 TULSA ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOHN RICHEY. This case was filed in Cherokee County Courts, Cherokee County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is HUGGINS, GARY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0149

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Cherokee, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

HUGGINS, GARY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TULSA ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC.

Defendants

RICHEY, DONNA

RICHEY, JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

COFFMAN & SEIDENBERGER PLLC

Attorney at COFFMAN & SEIDENBERGER PLLC

3745 E 31St St

Tulsa, OK 74135

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED DIRECT (D.RICHEY)

06/01/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED DIRECT (D.RICHEY)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2022
  • HearingEvent: DISPO. DKT KIRKLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS RETURN-(DONNA AND JOHN RICHEY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED DIRECT (J.RICHEY); Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED DIRECT (D.RICHEY); Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less