This case was last updated from Tulsa County Courts on 04/25/2022 at 10:05:15 (UTC).

TTCU The Credit Union, Plaintiff, and TTCU Federal Credit Union aka, Plaintiff, v. Chris Hale Jr, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 07/31/2018 TTCU The Credit Union, Plaintiff, and TTCU Federal Credit Union aka, Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Chris Hale Jr, Defendant. This case was filed in Tulsa County Courts, Tulsa County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2657

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tulsa, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TTCU Federal Credit Union aka

TTCU The Credit Union

Defendant

Hale, Chris Jr

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: CHRIS HALE JR BY SERV JACE KELLEY 8/7/18

08/17/2018: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: CHRIS HALE JR BY SERV JACE KELLEY 8/7/18

JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

09/17/2018: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS - CONTINUING WAGE

09/26/2018: GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS - CONTINUING WAGE

ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT BY LUFTHANSA TECHNIK LOGISTIC AM. W/E N/A (SEE FILE). $0

12/03/2018: ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT BY LUFTHANSA TECHNIK LOGISTIC AM. W/E N/A (SEE FILE). $0

ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT BY LUFTHANSA TECHNIK LOGISITIC AM. W/E 11/15/18 $307.22

12/04/2018: ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT BY LUFTHANSA TECHNIK LOGISITIC AM. W/E 11/15/18 $307.22

ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT BY LUFTHANSA TECHNIK LOGISTIC AM. W/E 11/30/18 $334.40

12/17/2018: ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT BY LUFTHANSA TECHNIK LOGISTIC AM. W/E 11/30/18 $334.40

ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT BY LUFTHANSA TECHNIK LOGISTIC AM. W/E 12/15/18 $293.82

12/26/2018: ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT BY LUFTHANSA TECHNIK LOGISTIC AM. W/E 12/15/18 $293.82

ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT BY LUFTHANSA TECHNIK LOGISTIC AM. W/E 12-31-18 $366.37

01/07/2019: ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT BY LUFTHANSA TECHNIK LOGISTIC AM. W/E 12-31-18 $366.37

ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT BY LUFTHANSA TECKNIK COMPONENT SV W/E 1-15-19 $357.93

02/05/2019: ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT BY LUFTHANSA TECKNIK COMPONENT SV W/E 1-15-19 $357.93

ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT BY LUFTHANSA TECHNIK COMPONENTS SV W/E 1-31-19 $305.71

04/12/2019: ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT BY LUFTHANSA TECHNIK COMPONENTS SV W/E 1-31-19 $305.71

ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT BY LUFTHANSA TECHNIK COMPONENTS SV W/E 2-15-19 $0.00

04/12/2019: ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT BY LUFTHANSA TECHNIK COMPONENTS SV W/E 2-15-19 $0.00

RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

04/15/2019: RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2019
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED - RELEASE AND SATISFIED; Dismissed- Settled; Party Details; Defendant: Hale, Chris Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DISPDMRS; Description: RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Count: 1; Party: Hale, Chris Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: ATG; Description: ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT BY LUFTHANSA TECHNIK COMPONENTS SV; W/E 2-15-19; $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: ATG; Description: ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT BY LUFTHANSA TECHNIK COMPONENTS SV; W/E 1-31-19; $305.71

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketCode: ATG; Description: ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT BY .; EXPIRED NOTARY; LUFTHANSA TECHNIK COMPONENTS SV; SENT IT BACK WITH A LETTER EXPLAINING WE CAN NOT ACCEPT THE "ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT" DUE TO THE NOTARY COMMISSION OR STAMP DATE HAS EXPIRED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketCode: ATG; Description: ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT BY .; EXPIRED NOTARY; LUFTHANSA TECHNIK COMPONENTS SV; SENT IT BACK WITH A LETTER EXPLAINING WE CAN NOT ACCEPT THE "ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT" DUE TO THE NOTARY COMMISSION OR STAMP DATE HAS EXPIRED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: ATG; Description: ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT BY LUFTHANSA TECKNIK COMPONENT SV; W/E 1-15-19; $357.93

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: ATG; Description: ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT BY LUFTHANSA TECHNIK LOGISTIC AM.; W/E 12-31-18; $366.37

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: ATG; Description: ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT BY LUFTHANSA TECHNIK LOGISTIC AM. W/E 12/15/18 $293.82

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: ATG; Description: ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT BY LUFTHANSA TECHNIK LOGISTIC AM. W/E 11/30/18 $334.40

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2018-3804329 ON 07/31/2018. PAYOR: TTCU THE CREDIT UNION AKA TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 58.00. LINE ITEMS: SC-2018-12657: $45.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. SC-2018-12657: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. SC-2018-12657: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE OTEY, MILLIE TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketCode: A/; Description: AMOUNT IN DEBT OF $2,744.96

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketCode: SMIP; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED - PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketCode: AFDC1; Description: AFFIDAVIT; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketCode: SCNOTE1; Description: PROMISSORY NOTE less than $5000.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SMALL CLAIMS INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: PROMISSORY NOTE less than $5000.00.(SCNOTE1); Filed By: Ttcu The Credit Union AKA

    Read MoreRead Less