This case was last updated from Bryan County Courts on 04/07/2022 at 07:31:01 (UTC).

TOWNHOME PROPERTIES LLC V. MARK EMERY WILLIAMSON

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 TOWNHOME PROPERTIES LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARK EMERY WILLIAMSON. This case was filed in Bryan County Courts, Bryan County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0056

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Bryan, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOWNHOME PROPERTIES LLC

Defendant

WILLIAMSON, MARK EMERY

 

Court Documents

FILE AFFIDAVIT & ISSUE ORDER

02/05/2021: FILE AFFIDAVIT & ISSUE ORDER

ISSUE CONTINUING POSTJUDGMENT EARNINGS GARNISHMENT

04/02/2021: ISSUE CONTINUING POSTJUDGMENT EARNINGS GARNISHMENT

RETN'D CERTIFIED MAIL - UNABLE TO FORWARD

05/10/2021: RETN'D CERTIFIED MAIL - UNABLE TO FORWARD

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE TRACKING HISTORY - NO RETURN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETN'D CERTIFIED MAIL - UNABLE TO FORWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETN'D CERTIFIED MAIL - UNABLE TO FORWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT; Amount: $ 63.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: TO BE IN DEFAULT. JUDGMENT FOR PLAIN FOR $4,212.21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: TIMES IN THE CORRIDORS, AND FAILS TO ANSWER. DEF FOUND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEFENDANT CALLED THREE TIMES IN OPEN COURT, AND THREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM: PLAIN APPEARED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: WILLIAMSON 02/09/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE RETURN OF SERVICE W/ RETURN AFFIDAVIT MARK EMERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT & ISSUE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DOCKET FEE; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less