This case was last updated from Creek County Courts on 04/12/2022 at 15:28:12 (UTC).

TOWER LOANS V. EMILY MCNETT

Case Summary

On 08/18/2021 TOWER LOANS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against EMILY MCNETT. This case was filed in Creek County Courts, Creek County Courthouse - Sapulpa Division located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is SERNER, JASON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0365

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Creek, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

SERNER, JASON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOWER LOANS

Defendant

MCNETT, EMILY

 

Court Documents

GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT CLEAN FREAKS

10/04/2021: GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT CLEAN FREAKS

GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED BY CERT MAIL BY COURT CLERK

10/04/2021: GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED BY CERT MAIL BY COURT CLERK

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERT MAIL RETURNED SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL INTERPRETER TRANSLATOR; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • HearingEvent: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • HearingEvent: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: $771.33 + COSTS + FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM:JS:NO CSR: 9-15-21 - JUDGMENT TO THE PLAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT RETURNED SERVED 9-1-21 BY PSL GASS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER ISSUED (UNDER $5000.); Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less