This case was last updated from Washington County Courts on 06/03/2022 at 02:18:46 (UTC).

TOWER LOANS V. AMY WALLER

Case Summary

On 03/10/2021 TOWER LOANS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AMY WALLER. This case was filed in Washington County Courts, Washington County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is FRANKS, KYRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0121

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Washington, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

FRANKS, KYRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOWER LOANS

Defendant

WALLER, AMY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • HearingEvent: STATEMENT OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATEMENT OF JUDGMENT (SM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • HearingEvent: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • HearingEvent: JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: $1,255.00 PLUS THE COSTS OF $108.00. (WG)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF THE PLTF FOR THE AMOUNT OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: BEING SERVED & NAME SOUNDED. CRT GRANTS DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM:FRANKS-PLTF W/OUT ATTY- DEFT DOES NOT APPEAR AFTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 3-30-21 (SM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT, RET'D SERVED; DIANA MAPLES FOR AMY WALLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER, ISSUED (TO PLTF TO SERVE)(SM); Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less