This case was last updated from Canadian County Courts on 04/14/2022 at 17:49:50 (UTC).

TOWER LOANS, Plaintiff, v. AARON DAVIS, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 09/09/2021 TOWER LOANS, Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against AARON DAVIS, Defendant. This case was filed in Canadian County Courts, Canadian County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-950

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Canadian, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOWER LOANS

Defendant

DAVIS, AARON

Garnishee

BASKIN-ROBBINS

 

Court Documents

SMALL CLAIMS INITIAL FILING. // AFFIDAVIT / ORDER FILED $479.85 FOR BALANCE ON LOAN

09/09/2021: SMALL CLAIMS INITIAL FILING. // AFFIDAVIT / ORDER FILED $479.85 FOR BALANCE ON LOAN

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED

09/09/2021: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED

AFFIDAVIT / ORDER RETURN FILED SERVED: AARON PERSONALLY 9/14/2021 PPS FEE: $40

09/23/2021: AFFIDAVIT / ORDER RETURN FILED SERVED: AARON PERSONALLY 9/14/2021 PPS FEE: $40

JOURNAL ENTRY FILED

10/18/2021: JOURNAL ENTRY FILED

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED

10/18/2021: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED

GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT FILED

11/19/2021: GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT FILED

CONTINUING POSTJUDGMENT EARNINGS GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED BY CERTIFIED MAIL FOR SERVICE

11/19/2021: CONTINUING POSTJUDGMENT EARNINGS GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED BY CERTIFIED MAIL FOR SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2021-686934 ON 11/19/2021. PAYOR: TOWER LOANS TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 116.64. LINE ITEMS: SC-2021-950: $73.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. SC-2021-950: $0.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. SC-2021-950: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. SC-2021-950: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. SC-2021-950: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. SC-2021-950: $0.98 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. SC-2021-950: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. SC-2021-950: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN04; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCode: CCRMPF; Description: COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN05; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $5 COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN155; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $1.55 COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCode: SJFIS; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND - INTERPRETER AND TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN0155; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $1.55 COLLECTION; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: GSIM; Description: CONTINUING POSTJUDGMENT EARNINGS GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED BY CERTIFIED MAIL FOR SERVICE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2021-680211 ON 09/09/2021. PAYOR: TOWER LOANS TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 58.00. LINE ITEMS: SC-2021-950: $45.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. SC-2021-950: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. SC-2021-950: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE JUDGE NOT LISTED TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: ANMS; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED; Party: TOWER LOANS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMIP; Description: AFFIDAVIT / ORDER ISSUED - PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER; Party: TOWER LOANS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: AFDC1; Description: AFFIDAVIT; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: SCINDEBT1; Description: INDEBTEDNESS less than $5000.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SMALL CLAIMS INITIAL FILING. // AFFIDAVIT / ORDER FILED $479.85 FOR BALANCE ON LOAN; Party: TOWER LOANS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS less than $5000.00.(SCINDEBT1); Filed By: TOWER LOANS

    Read MoreRead Less