This case was last updated from Logan County Courts on 05/17/2022 at 03:12:15 (UTC).

Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2020-3 VS Occupants Of The Premises Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/11/2021 Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2020-3 filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Occupants Of The Premises. This case was filed in Logan County Courts, Logan County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Duel, Louis A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1-24

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Logan, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Duel, Louis A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2020-3

Defendants

Twin Lakes Sports Club Association, Inc

Occupants Of The Premises

Spouse Of Ruby T Cooper

Decedent

Cooper, Ruby T

Interested Parties

Ghassempour, Abe

Kellogg, John A.

Slaughter, Karen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Howell, Jason

Triad Center I, Ste. 550, 7666 E. 61St St. Jhowell@Kivell.Com

Tulsa, OK 74133

Defendant Attorney

Sepkowitz, Jerome S.

Attorney at Derryberry & Naifeh, LLP

4800 North Lincoln Boulevard

Oklahoma City, OK 73105

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

02/11/2021: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED BACK TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON SPOUSE OF RUBY T COOPER

02/11/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED BACK TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON SPOUSE OF RUBY T COOPER

SUMMONS ISSUED BACK TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON OCCUPANTS OF THE PREMISES

02/11/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED BACK TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON OCCUPANTS OF THE PREMISES

SUMMONS ISSUED BACK TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON TWIN LAKES SPORTS CLUB ASSOCIATION

02/11/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED BACK TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON TWIN LAKES SPORTS CLUB ASSOCIATION

PETITION FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE / EXHIBIT A-F

02/11/2021: PETITION FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE / EXHIBIT A-F

NOTICE OF HEARING MOTION TO CONFIRM SALE

04/19/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING MOTION TO CONFIRM SALE

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING NOTICE OF SALE OF LEASEHOLD ESTATE UNDER EXECUTION

04/19/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING NOTICE OF SALE OF LEASEHOLD ESTATE UNDER EXECUTION

MOTION TO CONFIRM SALE

04/19/2022: MOTION TO CONFIRM SALE

SPECIAL EXECUTION AND ORDER OF ALIAS SALE RETURNED / NOTICE OF ALIAS SALE OF LEASEHOLD ESTATE UNDER EXECUTION / SHERIFF'S RETURN ON SPECIAL EXECUTION AND ORDER OF ALIAS SALE

04/19/2022: SPECIAL EXECUTION AND ORDER OF ALIAS SALE RETURNED / NOTICE OF ALIAS SALE OF LEASEHOLD ESTATE UNDER EXECUTION / SHERIFF'S RETURN ON SPECIAL EXECUTION AND ORDER OF ALIAS SALE

AFFIDVIT OF PUBLICATION (GUTHRIE NEWS LEADER - MARCH 16 & 23, 2022)

04/04/2022: AFFIDVIT OF PUBLICATION (GUTHRIE NEWS LEADER - MARCH 16 & 23, 2022)

SPECIAL EXECUTION AND ORDER OF ALIAS SALE ISSUED TO LOGAN COUNTY SHERIFF / NOTICE OF ALIAS SALE OF LEASEHOLD ESTATE UNDER EXECUTION / SHERIFF'S RETURN ON SPECIAL EXECUTION AND ORDER OF ALIAS SALE

02/28/2022: SPECIAL EXECUTION AND ORDER OF ALIAS SALE ISSUED TO LOGAN COUNTY SHERIFF / NOTICE OF ALIAS SALE OF LEASEHOLD ESTATE UNDER EXECUTION / SHERIFF'S RETURN ON SPECIAL EXECUTION AND ORDER OF ALIAS SALE

AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION (GUTHRIE NEWS LEADER - (JANUARY 5 & 12, 2022)

01/27/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION (GUTHRIE NEWS LEADER - (JANUARY 5 & 12, 2022)

SPECIAL EXECUTION AND ORDER OF SALE RETURNED / NOTICE OF SALE OF LEASEHOLD ESTATE UNDER EXECUTION / SHERIFF'S RETURN ON SPECIAL EXECUTION AND ORDER OF SALE / APPRAISEMENT OF LEASHOLD ESTATE UNDER EXECUTION / OATH OF APPRAISERS / APPRAISERS RETURN / B

01/12/2022: SPECIAL EXECUTION AND ORDER OF SALE RETURNED / NOTICE OF SALE OF LEASEHOLD ESTATE UNDER EXECUTION / SHERIFF'S RETURN ON SPECIAL EXECUTION AND ORDER OF SALE / APPRAISEMENT OF LEASHOLD ESTATE UNDER EXECUTION / OATH OF APPRAISERS / APPRAISERS RETURN / BILL AOF APPRAISERS / FAXED LETTER FORM KIVELL, RAYMENT AND FRANCIS - RECALLED

SPECIAL EXECUTION AND ORDER OF SALE ISSUED TO LOGAN COUNTY SHERIFF / NOTICE OF SALE OF LEASEHOLD ESTATE UNDER EXECUTION / SHERIFF'S RETURN ON SPECIAL EXECUTION AND ORDER OF SALE / APPRAISEMENT OF LEASHOLD ESTATE UNDER EXECUTION / OATH OF APPRAISERS /

12/15/2021: SPECIAL EXECUTION AND ORDER OF SALE ISSUED TO LOGAN COUNTY SHERIFF / NOTICE OF SALE OF LEASEHOLD ESTATE UNDER EXECUTION / SHERIFF'S RETURN ON SPECIAL EXECUTION AND ORDER OF SALE / APPRAISEMENT OF LEASHOLD ESTATE UNDER EXECUTION / OATH OF APPRAISERS / APPRAISERS RETURN / BILL AOF APPRAISERS

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

11/19/2021: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

FINAL JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

11/05/2021: FINAL JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

ORDER GRATNING PLAITNIFF'S MOTIN FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

11/05/2021: ORDER GRATNING PLAITNIFF'S MOTIN FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

09/27/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • HearingEvent: PLAIN 'S MOTION TO CONFIRM SALE; Party: Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2020-3; Docket: Louis A Duel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketCode: PP; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION (GUTHRIE NEWS LEADER - APRIL 20 & 27, 2022); Party: Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2020-3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOH; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING MOTION TO CONFIRM SALE; Party: Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2020-3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFM; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING NOTICE OF SALE OF LEASEHOLD ESTATE UNDER EXECUTION; Party: Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2020-3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MOCS; Description: MOTION TO CONFIRM SALE; Party: Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2020-3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SEOS; Description: SPECIAL EXECUTION AND ORDER OF ALIAS SALE RETURNED / NOTICE OF ALIAS SALE OF LEASEHOLD ESTATE UNDER EXECUTION / SHERIFF'S RETURN ON SPECIAL EXECUTION AND ORDER OF ALIAS SALE; Party: Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2020-3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PP; Description: AFFIDVIT OF PUBLICATION (GUTHRIE NEWS LEADER - MARCH 16 & 23, 2022); Party: Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2020-3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2022-283787 ON 02/28/2022. PAYOR: KIVELL, RAYMENT AND FRANCIS PC TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 76.64. LINE ITEMS: CJ-2021-24: $33.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES FOR TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2020-3. CJ-2021-24: $0.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND FOR TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2020-3. CJ-2021-24: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES FOR TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2020-3. CJ-2021-24: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND FOR TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2020-3. CJ-2021-24: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS FOR TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2020-3. CJ-2021-24: $0.98 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND FOR TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2020-3. CJ-2021-24: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND FOR TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2020-3. CJ-2021-24: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE FOR TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2020-3.; Party: Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2020-3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: ISEO; Description: SPECIAL EXECUTION AND ORDER OF ALIAS SALE ISSUED TO LOGAN COUNTY SHERIFF / NOTICE OF ALIAS SALE OF LEASEHOLD ESTATE UNDER EXECUTION / SHERIFF'S RETURN ON SPECIAL EXECUTION AND ORDER OF ALIAS SALE; Party: Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2020-3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN04; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COLLECTIONS; Party: Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2020-3; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
87 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCode: FORE; Description: FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE / EXHIBIT A-F; Count: 1; Party: Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2020-3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketIssue #2; Issue: FORECLOSURE(FORE); Filed By: Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2020-3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: PROMISSORY NOTE(NOTE); Filed By: Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2020-3

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOWELL, JASON