This case was last updated from Osage County Courts on 05/28/2022 at 00:32:31 (UTC).

TOMCO APARTMENTS V. EMILY PRATT

Case Summary

On 07/16/2018 TOMCO APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against EMILY PRATT. This case was filed in Osage County Courts, Osage County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is TATE, STUART. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0156

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Osage, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

TATE, STUART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOMCO APARTMENTS

Defendant

PRATT, EMILY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2018
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • HearingEvent: SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT MINUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: THEREAFTER PLTF MAY SEEK WRIT OF ASSISTANCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: BY JULY 30,2018 (MONDAY) @ 9AM. IF DEFT REMAINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LONG AS PAYMENTS ARE BEING MADE. DEFT TO VACATE PEMISIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MONTH UNTIL PD IN FUL NO LEVY OR EXECUTION TO ISSUE AS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAST DAY OF AUGUST 2018 AND ON THE LAST DAY OF EACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: THE CREDITOR IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00 TO BEGIN ON THE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SKIATOOK OK OSAGE. JUDGMENT DEBTOR TO MAKE PAYMENTS TO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AWARDED POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY 1504 W 4TH ST #32.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT COSTS OF 58.00 AND SERVICE FEES OF 50.00. PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GOOD. JUDGMENT TO PLTF IN THE AMOUNT OF 790.00 PLUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GRAHAM APPEARS. DEFT EMILY PRATT APPEARS. SERVICE IS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SC CM; JUDGE TATE ON FOR FED HEARING. PLTF MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT RET SERVING RESP ON 7-17-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT/ORDER ISSUED BY OCSO; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT/ORDER; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less