This case was last updated from McIntosh County Courts on 07/16/2022 at 10:48:34 (UTC).

TINKER FEDERAL CREDIT UNION V. JOHN T. MCBRIDE

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 TINKER FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against JOHN T MCBRIDE. This case was filed in McIntosh County Courts, McIntosh County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is HOGAN, MIKE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0004

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    McIntosh, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

HOGAN, MIKE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TINKER FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

MCBRIDE, JOHN T.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BOREN, BART A

401 N Hudson Ave., Suite 200

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2022
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT FOR DEBT COLLECTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORIG SUMMONS RET'D AS SERVING(STEVEN MCBRIDE 1-29-22)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEAR (BOREN & ASS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPOSITION OF COLLATERAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OF COLLATERAL AND NOTICE FORBIDDING A TRANSFER OR OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PRE-JUDGMENT NOTICE TO APPEAR AND DISCLOSE THE LOCATION

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less