This case was last updated from Caddo County Courts on 05/02/2022 at 04:01:05 (UTC).

TINKER FEDERAL CREDIT UNION V. CHARHITA SHELTON

Case Summary

On 06/18/2018 TINKER FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHARHITA SHELTON. This case was filed in Caddo County Courts, Caddo County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is KIRKLAND, HONORABLE KORY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0045

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Caddo, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

KIRKLAND, HONORABLE KORY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TINKER FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

SHELTON, CHARHITA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SCHROEDER, SPENCER F

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Po Box 1301

Chickasha, OK 73023

LUDLAM, JEFFERY S.

Attorney at HALL & LUDLAM

210 Park Avenue, Suite 3001

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2019
  • HearingEvent: HEARING ON ASSETS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ---SERVED CHARHITA SHELTON ON 12-15-18 BY JAMES PIERCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE & ORDER TO APPEAR AS TO ASSETS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • HearingEvent: HEARING ON ASSETS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (1-23-2019 @ 10:30AM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AGREED ORDER RESETTING TFCU'S HEARING ON ASSETS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE: SPENCER SCHROEDER ATT FOR DEFNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ( ATTY TO SERVE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPOSITION OF PROPERTY 12-19-18 @ 10:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: INTERROGATORIES AND FORBIDDING A TRANSFER OR OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AND ENTER PETITION-$10001.00 OR MORE; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less