This case was last updated from Grady County Courts on 05/22/2022 at 01:00:31 (UTC).

TIM BERRY V. DEREDACT SALES, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 04/29/2021 TIM BERRY filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against DEREDACT SALES. This case was filed in Grady County Courts, Grady County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is KIRKLAND, KORY S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0081

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Grady, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

KIRKLAND, KORY S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BERRY, TIM

Defendants

SALES, DEREDACT

SALES, BEVERLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WILLIAMS, BEAU

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

4901 Richmond Square, Ste 104

Oklahoma City, OK 73118

O'BRIEN, CHASE A.

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

P.O. Box 609

Chickasha, OK 73018

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE

05/03/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, CHASE A O'BRIEN/DEFTS

05/17/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, CHASE A O'BRIEN/DEFTS

DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO PETITION

05/17/2022: DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2022
  • HearingEvent: MOTION DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, CHASE A O'BRIEN/DEFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PLTF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT - 5-19-22 @ 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED DEREDACT AND BEVERLY SALES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS FEE TO ISSUE- DEREDACT & BEVERLY; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND - EFFECTIVE 1-1-2005; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAMS, BEAU