This case was last updated from Oklahoma County Courts on 01/15/2023 at 22:15:29 (UTC).

TIAA FSB VS Germany, Don R. Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 TIAA FSB filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Germany, Don R. This case was filed in Oklahoma County Courts, Oklahoma County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Timmons, Aletia Haynes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-336

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Oklahoma, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Timmons, Aletia Haynes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TIAA FSB

Defendants

Germany, Pamela L

Germany, Don R.

Internal Revenue Services

Oklahoma Tax Commission

Wells Fargo Bank N A

Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAYER, BRIAN G

Attorney at THE SAYER LAW GROUP, P.C.

4833 S. Sheridan, Suite 418

Tulsa, OK 74145

Defendant Attorneys

DAWSON, JACK

Attorney at MILLER DOLLARHIDE PC

309 Nw 9Th Street

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Lankford, Morgan

Attorney at Assistant General Counsel

Oklahoma Tax Commission, P O Box 269056

Oklahoma City, OK 73126

Hardin, Mark E

907 South Detroit Suite 815

Tulsa, OK 74120

 

Court Documents

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

07/29/2020: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

FIRST AMENDED PETITION FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE

06/19/2020: FIRST AMENDED PETITION FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE

ORDER GRANTING EX-PART EMOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND

06/11/2020: ORDER GRANTING EX-PART EMOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND

AMENDED ANSWER, CROSS-CLAIM AND COUNTER-CLAIM OF DEFENDANT, FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION D/B/A FREDDIE MAC

10/21/2020: AMENDED ANSWER, CROSS-CLAIM AND COUNTER-CLAIM OF DEFENDANT, FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION D/B/A FREDDIE MAC

DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE STAY

10/21/2020: DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE STAY

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND RESERVATION OF TIME

07/07/2020: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND RESERVATION OF TIME

ANSWER OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA EX REL., OKLAHOMA TAX COMMISSION TO PLAIN 'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION

07/13/2020: ANSWER OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA EX REL., OKLAHOMA TAX COMMISSION TO PLAIN 'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION

DEFENDANTS WELLS FARGO BANK, NA AND FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION D/B/A FREDDIE MAC'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

07/28/2020: DEFENDANTS WELLS FARGO BANK, NA AND FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION D/B/A FREDDIE MAC'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER

10/21/2020: ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER

ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL

09/26/2022: ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

09/21/2022: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

08/19/2022: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/18/2022: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE - ATTORNEY CAITLIN WILGUESS FOR DEFENDANT

08/12/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE - ATTORNEY CAITLIN WILGUESS FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF HEARING

07/20/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE ATTORNEYS MARK E HARDIN AND ELISE EBRIGHT FOR DEFENDANTS

06/30/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE ATTORNEYS MARK E HARDIN AND ELISE EBRIGHT FOR DEFENDANTS

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE ATTORNEY ELISE EBRIGHT FOR DEFENDANTS

06/30/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE ATTORNEY ELISE EBRIGHT FOR DEFENDANTS

MOTION TO DEEM CONFESSED DEFENDANT FREDDIE MAC'S MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

06/30/2022: MOTION TO DEEM CONFESSED DEFENDANT FREDDIE MAC'S MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

66 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: OAWD; Description: ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MO; Description: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CM; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • HearingEvent: MOTION TO DEEM CONFESSED DEFENDANT FREDDIE MAC'S MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Docket: Aletia Haynes Timmons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: OG; Description: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE TIMMONS: MOTION TO DEEM CONFESSED DEFENDANT FREDDIE MAC'S MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - GRANTED; ORDER SIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: EAA; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE - ATTORNEY CAITLIN WILGUESS FOR DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOH; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: EAA; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE ATTORNEYS MARK E HARDIN AND ELISE EBRIGHT FOR DEFENDANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: EAA; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE ATTORNEY ELISE EBRIGHT FOR DEFENDANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: FORE; Description: FORECLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF MORE THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: FORECLOSURE(FORE); Filed By: TIAA FSB; Disposed: Pending.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less