This case was last updated from Logan County Courts on 09/03/2021 at 06:37:23 (UTC).

The John Augustus Bryant Trust Indenture Date 12-17-1987 As Amended v. Vaughan, Shayna, an individual MSRV Corporation, an Oklahoma Corporation STOG Management Corporation, an Oklahoma Corporation

Case Summary

On 12/23/2020 The John Augustus Bryant Trust Indenture Date 12-17-1987 As Amended filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Vaughan, Shayna, an individual MSRV Corporation, an Oklahoma Corporation STOG Management Corporation, an Oklahoma Corporation. This case was filed in Logan County Courts, Logan County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Corley, Phillip C.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-172

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Logan, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Corley, Phillip C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The John Augustus Bryant Trust Indenture Date As Amended

Defendants

STOG Management Corporation

Vaughan, Shayna

MSRV Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Solomon, G. Michael

116 W. 7Th Ave. Suite 335

Edmond, OK 73013

Solomon, G Michael

116 W. 7Th Ave.Suite 335

Stillwater, OK 74074

 

Court Documents

PETITION

12/23/2020: PETITION

SUMMONS ISSUED BACK TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON MSRV CORPORATION C/O SHAYNA VAUGHAN-REGISTERED AGENT

12/23/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED BACK TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON MSRV CORPORATION C/O SHAYNA VAUGHAN-REGISTERED AGENT

SUMMONS ISSUED BACK TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON MSRV CORPORATION

01/22/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED BACK TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON MSRV CORPORATION

RETURN OF SERVICE

02/19/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE

02/19/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE

02/19/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RET; Description: RETURN OF SERVICE; Party: The John Augustus Bryant Trust Indenture Date 12-17-1987 As Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RET; Description: RETURN OF SERVICE; Party: The John Augustus Bryant Trust Indenture Date 12-17-1987 As Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RET; Description: RETURN OF SERVICE; Party: The John Augustus Bryant Trust Indenture Date 12-17-1987 As Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMIMA; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED BACK TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON MSRV CORPORATION; Party: The John Augustus Bryant Trust Indenture Date 12-17-1987 As Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2021-272353 ON 01/21/2021. PAYOR: OVERALL/TASHA TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 10.00. LINE ITEMS: CJ-2020-172: $9.75 ON AC01 CLERK FEES FOR THE JOHN AUGUSTUS BRYANT TRUST INDENTURE DATE 12-17-1987 AS AMENDED. CJ-2020-172: $0.25 ON AC09 CARD ALLOCATIONS FOR THE JOHN AUGUSTUS BRYANT TRUST INDENTURE DATE 12-17-1987 AS AMENDED.; Party: The John Augustus Bryant Trust Indenture Date 12-17-1987 As Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: ADJUSTING ENTRY: MONIES DUE TO THE FOLLOWING AGENCIES REDUCED BY THE FOLLOWING AMOUNTS:CJ-2020-172: AC01 CLERK FEES -$0.25; Party: The John Augustus Bryant Trust Indenture Date 12-17-1987 As Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCode: ADJUST; Description: ADJUSTING ENTRY: MONIES DUE TO AC09-CARD ALLOCATION; Party: The John Augustus Bryant Trust Indenture Date 12-17-1987 As Amended; Amount: $ 0.25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCode: SMF; Description: SUMMONS FEE; Party: The John Augustus Bryant Trust Indenture Date 12-17-1987 As Amended; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2020-271593 ON 12/23/2020. PAYOR: OVERALL/TASHA TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 239.64. LINE ITEMS: CJ-2020-172: $168.70 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CJ-2020-172: $6.00 ON AC09 CARD ALLOCATIONS. CJ-2020-172: $5.85 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. CJ-2020-172: $0.64 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2020-172: $4.87 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CJ-2020-172: $1.51 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2020-172: $6.82 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY. CJ-2020-172: $0.43 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CJ-2020-172: $0.95 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2020-172: $24.37 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2020-172: $9.75 ON AC81 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND. CJ-2020-172: $9.75 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: ADJUSTING ENTRY: MONIES DUE TO THE FOLLOWING AGENCIES REDUCED BY THE FOLLOWING AMOUNTS:CJ-2020-172: AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE -$0.25CJ-2020-172: AC81 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND -$0.25CJ-2020-172: AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND -$0.63CJ-2020-172: AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND -$0.03CJ-2020-172: AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS -$0.02CJ-2020-172: AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY -$0.18CJ-2020-172: AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND -$0.04CJ-2020-172: AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES -$0.13CJ-2020-172: AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND -$0.02CJ-2020-172: AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL -$0.15CJ-2020-172: AC01 CLERK FEES -$4.30

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketCode: NEGL; Description: NEGLIGENCE (GENERAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: NEGLIGENCE (GENERAL)(NEGL); Filed By: The John Augustus Bryant Trust Indenture Date 12-17-1987 As Amended

    Read MoreRead Less