This case was last updated from Oklahoma County Courts on 04/13/2022 at 12:27:27 (UTC).

The City of Oklahoma City, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION Plaintiff, v. Al-Wali INC, AN OKLAHOMA CORPORATION Defendant.

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 The City of Oklahoma City, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION Plaintiff filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against Al-Wali INC, AN OKLAHOMA CORPORATION Defendant. This case was filed in Oklahoma County Courts, Oklahoma County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Dishman, C. Brent. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-129

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Oklahoma, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Dishman, C. Brent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The City of Oklahoma City

Defendant

Al-Wali INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Burnett, Jill A

200 North Walker 4Th Floor

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

PETITION AND APPLICATION TO SUMMON AND APPOINT COMMISSIONERS

01/21/2022: PETITION AND APPLICATION TO SUMMON AND APPOINT COMMISSIONERS

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE: JILL A. BURNETT FOR PLAIN

01/21/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE: JILL A. BURNETT FOR PLAIN

NOTICE OF DEFENDANT OF PLAIN 'S APPLICATION TO SUMMON AND APPOINT COMMISSIONERS

01/21/2022: NOTICE OF DEFENDANT OF PLAIN 'S APPLICATION TO SUMMON AND APPOINT COMMISSIONERS

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAILING BY CERT. MAIL TO AL-WALI, INC C/O SHAHIDA ASIF, SERV. AGENT SIGN BY ILLEG. ON 1/27/22

02/08/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAILING BY CERT. MAIL TO AL-WALI, INC C/O SHAHIDA ASIF, SERV. AGENT SIGN BY ILLEG. ON 1/27/22

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

03/03/2022: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Other; Party Details; Defendant: Al-Wali INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DISPDWOP; Description: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Count: 1; Party: Al-Wali INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • HearingEvent: PETITION AND APPLICATION TO SUMMON AND APPOINT COMMISSIONERS - STRICKEN; Docket: C. Brent Dishman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFM; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAILING BY CERT. MAIL TO AL-WALI, INC C/O SHAHIDA ASIF, SERV. AGENT SIGN BY ILLEG. ON 1/27/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE DISHMAN, C. BRENT TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NO; Description: NOTICE OF DEFENDANT OF PLAIN 'S APPLICATION TO SUMMON AND APPOINT COMMISSIONERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: EAA; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE: JILL A. BURNETT FOR PLAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: P; Description: PETITION AND APPLICATION TO SUMMON AND APPOINT COMMISSIONERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN04; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: CCRMPF; Description: COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: CONDEMN; Description: CONDEMNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL MISC. INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: CONDEMNATION(CONDEMN); Filed By: The City of Oklahoma City

    Read MoreRead Less