This case was last updated from Payne County Courts on 01/18/2022 at 06:34:28 (UTC).

The Bank NA v. Cooper, Sara L

Case Summary

On 06/07/2018 The Bank NA filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Cooper, Sara L. This case was filed in Payne County Courts, Payne County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Hert, R. L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-662

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Payne, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Hert, R. L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Bank NA

Defendants

Cooper, Jeremy Shane

Cooper, Sara L

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT

06/07/2018: AFFIDAVIT

JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

07/18/2018: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

STATEMENT OF JUDGMENT

07/20/2018: STATEMENT OF JUDGMENT

RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIEN BY JUDGMENT CREDITOR

04/17/2019: RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIEN BY JUDGMENT CREDITOR

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: REL; Description: RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIEN BY JUDGMENT CREDITOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: JUDG; Description: STATEMENT OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: JEJ; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketCode: JE; Description: JUDGE HERT: THE PLAIN APPEARS BY REPRESENTATIVE. THE DEFENDANTS BOTH APPEAR PRO SE. THE COURT FINDS THE DEFENDANT HAS BEEN SERVED AND GRANTS A DEFAULT JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF $526.74 PLUS COURT COST AND INTEREST PER STATUTE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • HearingEvent: $526.74 deficiency balance; Party: The Bank NA; Docket: R. L. Hert

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: JUDGEMENT ENTERED; Judge; Party Details; Plaintiff: The Bank NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2018-575231 ON 06/07/2018. PAYOR: THE BANK NA TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 58.00. LINE ITEMS: SC-2018-662: $45.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. SC-2018-662: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. SC-2018-662: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE HERT, R. L. TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFDC1; Description: AFFIDAVIT; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: SCINDEBT1; Description: INDEBTEDNESS less than $5000.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SMALL CLAIMS INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS less than $5000.00.(SCINDEBT1); Filed By: The Bank NA

    Read MoreRead Less