This case was last updated from Custer County Courts on 04/26/2022 at 23:39:48 (UTC).

THE APPLICATION OF: WES WARREN, CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 THE APPLICATION OF WES WARREN, CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS was filed as a Property - Other Property lawsuit. This case was filed in Custer County Courts, Custer County Courts located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0007

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Custer, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WARREN, WES

Defendants

OKLAHOMA TAX COMMISSION

MOTOR VEHICLE DIVISION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

FRY, CHRISTOPHER G.

Attorney at ASSISTANT GENERAL COUNSEL

Po Box 269056

Oklahoma City, OK 73126

 

Court Documents

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FIL & SCANNED

02/18/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FIL & SCANNED

ANSWER FIL & SCANNED

02/18/2022: ANSWER FIL & SCANNED

JOURNAL ENTRY FIL & SCANNED

02/18/2022: JOURNAL ENTRY FIL & SCANNED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • HearingEvent: CS-TRACKING DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • HearingEvent: HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY FIL & SCANNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ANSWER FIL & SCANNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FIL & SCANNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OTC 01/31/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DELIVERY VERFICATION; FILE AND SCAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERT. MAIL TO OTC; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CHSC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AND ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less