This case was last updated from Haskell County Courts on 03/28/2022 at 19:24:20 (UTC).

THE APPLICATION OF: TOU YANG, ET. AL., CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS

Case Summary

On 05/17/2021 THE APPLICATION OF TOU YANG, , CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS was filed as a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit. This case was filed in Haskell County Courts, Haskell County Courthouse located in Seminole, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is HENDERSON, BRIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0022

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Haskell, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

HENDERSON, BRIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

YANG, TOU

THAO, YER

Defendants

MOORE, GEORGE CLIFFORD

STURNER, CHARLES T.

AKA CHARLES THEODORE STURNER

THE CHARLES T. STURNER REVOCABLE TR

STRAIN, REBECCA

THEIR KNOWN AND UNKNOWN HEIRS, EXECUTORS

ADMINISTRATORS

DEVISEES

AND ASSIGNS, IMMEDIATE AND REMOTE

IF LIVING, OR IF DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WALKER, DANIEL W.

201 S Wheeler Ave.

Sallisaw, OK 74955

 

Court Documents

PUBLICATION FILED

09/09/2021: PUBLICATION FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2021
  • HearingEvent: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PUBLICATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE BY PUBLICATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT TO OBTAIN SERVICE BY PUBLICATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTORNEY; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTORNEY; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTORNEY; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CHSC FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PDLTF; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION (ALL OTHER CIVIL W/LTF); Amount: $ 85.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less