This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 03/03/2021 at 22:18:52 (UTC).

THE APPLICATION OF: THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA EXREL, CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS

Case Summary

On 07/12/2016 THE APPLICATION OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA EXREL, CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS was filed as a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Pottawatomie, Oklahoma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0084

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA EXREL

Defendant

$9253.00 IN THE U.S CURRENCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

COCHRAN, RUSS ASST. D.A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/31/2019

DocketDescription: CONTINUED TO 1-17-19 AT 9:00 A.M.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/31/2019

DocketDescription: FILE ORDER TO CONTINUE COURT DATE - 1-3-19 HEARING; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2019

DocketDescription: FILE CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2019

HearingEvent: JURY TRIAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2019

HearingEvent: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2019

HearingEvent: AGREED JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2019

HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2019

DocketDescription: FILE AGREED JOURNAL ENTRY AND ORDER OF FORFEITURE; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/25/2019

DocketDescription: FILE REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2019

HearingEvent: MOTION TO ENTER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
02/07/2018

DocketDescription: FILE ORDER SETTING HEARING 2-21-18- AT 1.30; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2018

DocketDescription: FILE MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANTS; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2017

DocketDescription: DOCUMENTS AND FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2017

DocketDescription: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2017

DocketDescription: FILE THE OF OKLAHOMS ANSWERS TO DEFENDANTS FIRST; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2017

DocketDescription: FILE CLAIM AND ANSWER - RICHARD ANDERSON; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2017

DocketDescription: FILE FIRST DISCOVERY REQUEST TO PLAIN ; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2016

DocketDescription: FILE VERIFIED ANSWER OF LORETTA BURTON; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2016

DocketDescription: FILE RETURN OF SERVICE BY PERSONAL DELIVERY; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2016

DocketDescription: FILE NOTICE OF SEIZURE AND FORFEITURE; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

[+] Read More [-] Read Less