This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 06/02/2023 at 07:31:52 (UTC).

THE APPLICATION OF: THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA, EX REL., CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS

Case Summary

On 06/15/2022 THE APPLICATION OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA, EX REL , CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS was filed as a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Pottawatomie, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0085

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA, EX REL.

Defendants

$691.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY

2014 LAND ROVER, RANGE ROVER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BATEMAN-WOODS, STACY S.

 

Court Documents

FILE NOTICE OF SEIZURE AND FORFEITURE

06/15/2022: FILE NOTICE OF SEIZURE AND FORFEITURE

FILE MOTION TO APPOINT SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

07/18/2022: FILE MOTION TO APPOINT SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

FILE ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

08/29/2022: FILE ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

FILE RETURN OF SERVICE BY PERSONAL DELIVERY

09/12/2022: FILE RETURN OF SERVICE BY PERSONAL DELIVERY

FILE RESPONDENT'S ANSWER AND RESPONSE TO STATE'S NOTICE

03/27/2023: FILE RESPONDENT'S ANSWER AND RESPONSE TO STATE'S NOTICE

FILE STATE'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS

04/11/2023: FILE STATE'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS

FILE RETURN OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

04/11/2023: FILE RETURN OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

FILE COURT MINUTE- NOW ON THIS 26TH DAY OF APRIL, 2023

04/26/2023: FILE COURT MINUTE- NOW ON THIS 26TH DAY OF APRIL, 2023

 

Docket Entries

06/08/2023

HearingEvent: CIVIL DISPOSITION DOCKET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DOCKET ON JUNE 8, 2023 AT 3:30PM IN COURT ROOM #1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: THE ABOVE MENTIONED CASE IS NOW SET FOR THE DISPOSITION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE COURT MINUTE- NOW ON THIS 26TH DAY OF APRIL, 2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE RETURN OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE STATE'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OF SEIRZURE AND INTENDED FORFEITURE, MOTION TO DISMISS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE RESPONDENT'S ANSWER AND RESPONSE TO STATE'S NOTICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE RETURN OF SERVICE BY PERSONAL DELIVERY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE MOTION TO APPOINT SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE NOTICE OF SEIZURE AND FORFEITURE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less