This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 07/17/2023 at 05:25:58 (UTC).

THE APPLICATION OF: THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA, EX REL., CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 THE APPLICATION OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA, EX REL , CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS was filed as a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Pottawatomie, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0095

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA, EX REL.

Defendants

LOT FOUR (4) FAIRVIEW ACRES

2004 SIL MOBILE HOME

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BATEMAN-WOODS, STACY S.

 

Court Documents

FILE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

06/06/2022: FILE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

FILE ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL PRECESS SERVER

10/14/2021: FILE ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL PRECESS SERVER

FILE NOTICE AND ORDER SETTING HEARING-5-9-23 AT 9:00AM

03/16/2023: FILE NOTICE AND ORDER SETTING HEARING-5-9-23 AT 9:00AM

FILE ORDER AUTHROIZING SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

08/29/2022: FILE ORDER AUTHROIZING SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

FILE PETITION TO CONDUCT SALE OF FORFEITED PROPERTY

07/11/2022: FILE PETITION TO CONDUCT SALE OF FORFEITED PROPERTY

FILE DISCLAIMER AND WAIVER OF INTEREST

09/22/2021: FILE DISCLAIMER AND WAIVER OF INTEREST

FILE NOTICE AND ORDER OF HEARING ON STATE'S PETITION TO

08/29/2022: FILE NOTICE AND ORDER OF HEARING ON STATE'S PETITION TO

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

07/25/2022: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

FILE CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

05/17/2023: FILE CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

FILE ORDER TO DONATE AND TRANSFER FORFEITED PROPERTY TO

05/09/2023: FILE ORDER TO DONATE AND TRANSFER FORFEITED PROPERTY TO

FILE RETURN OF SERVIE BY POSTING

05/08/2023: FILE RETURN OF SERVIE BY POSTING

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

04/26/2023: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

04/17/2023: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

FILE AMENDED PETITION- PETITION OT DONATE AND TRANSFER

10/21/2022: FILE AMENDED PETITION- PETITION OT DONATE AND TRANSFER

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

09/06/2022: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

FILE MOTION FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

08/29/2022: FILE MOTION FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

FILE RETURN OF SERVICE BY POSTING

08/01/2022: FILE RETURN OF SERVICE BY POSTING

FILE NOTICE AND ORDER FOR HEARING ON STATE'S PETITION

07/20/2022: FILE NOTICE AND ORDER FOR HEARING ON STATE'S PETITION

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/09/2023

HearingEvent: HEARING DATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2023

HearingEvent: HEARING DATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ANOTHER AGENCY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER TO DONATE AND TRANSFER FORFEITED PROPERTY TO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE RETURN OF SERVIE BY POSTING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE NOTICE AND ORDER SETTING HEARING-5-9-23 AT 9:00AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE NOTICE AND ORDER SETTING HEARING 6-9-23 AT 9:00AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
06/09/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE JOURNAL ENTRY OF FEFEITURE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- 4-19-22

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF SEIZURE AND FORFEITURE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/14/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL PRECESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/14/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE MOTION APPOINT SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE DISCLAIMER AND WAIVER OF INTEREST

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AMENDED NOTICE OF SEIZURE AND FORFEITURE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE LIS PENDENS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE NOTICE OF SEIZURE AND FORFEITURE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less