This case was last updated from Murray County Courts on 04/29/2022 at 18:03:15 (UTC).

THE APPLICATION OF: THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA, CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS

Case Summary

On 08/07/2018 THE APPLICATION OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA, CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS was filed as a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit. This case was filed in Murray County Courts, Murray County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is DUCK, AARON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0039

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Murray, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

DUCK, AARON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA

Defendant

2001 32T ACURA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SAMPSON, SCOT

Po Box 308

Ardmore, OK 73401

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2018
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER OF FORFEITURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE'S NOTICE OF SEIZURE AND INTENDED FORFEITURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MAY. THE DEFENDANT MASON JAMES VELARDE CONFESSES THE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEFENDANT APPEARS IN PERSON WITH HIS ATTORNEY, JASON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CF-18-114. THE STATE APPEARS BY ADA, SCOT SAMPSON. THE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT ORDER: THIS MATTER COMES ON FOR PLEA IN CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • HearingEvent: H HEARING DATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: TODAY'S DATE OR THE FORFEITURE IS DEEMED ADMITTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE A VERIFIED ANSWER OR OBJECTION WITHIN 45 DAYS FROM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 7, 2018. RESPONENT WAS FURTHER ADVISED THAT SHE MUST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SEIZURE AND INTENDED FORFEITURE IN OPEN COURT ON AUGUST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JAMES VELARDE, WAS DULLY SERVED WITH THE NOTICE OF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT ORDER: THE COURT FINDS THAT THE RESPONDENT, MASON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE OF SEIZURE AND INTENDED FORFEITURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less