This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 02/03/2023 at 19:51:53 (UTC).

THE APPLICATION OF: THE STATE OF OKLA. EXREL-, CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS

Case Summary

On 09/12/2018 THE APPLICATION OF THE STATE OF OKLA EXREL-, CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS was filed as a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Pottawatomie, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0115

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE STATE OF OKLA. EXREL

Defendant

ONE (1) 2011 FORD FUSION

 

Court Documents

FILE NOTICE OF SEIZURE AND FORFEITURE

09/12/2018: FILE NOTICE OF SEIZURE AND FORFEITURE

FILE RETURN OF SERVICE BY PERSONAL DELIVERY

09/14/2018: FILE RETURN OF SERVICE BY PERSONAL DELIVERY

FILE AFFIDAVIT

03/26/2019: FILE AFFIDAVIT

FILE MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

03/27/2019: FILE MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

FILE CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

03/28/2019: FILE CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

FILE DEFAULT ORDER OF FORFEITURE

04/18/2019: FILE DEFAULT ORDER OF FORFEITURE

FILE COURT MINUTE - MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT GRANTED

04/18/2019: FILE COURT MINUTE - MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT GRANTED

FILE CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

06/02/2022: FILE CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

FILE MOTION TO APPOINT SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

06/02/2022: FILE MOTION TO APPOINT SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

FILE ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

06/06/2022: FILE ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

 

Docket Entries

06/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE MOTION TO APPOINT SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2019

HearingEvent: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2019

HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE COURT MINUTE - MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT GRANTED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE DEFAULT ORDER OF FORFEITURE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2018
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE RETURN OF SERVICE BY PERSONAL DELIVERY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2018
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE NOTICE OF SEIZURE AND FORFEITURE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less