This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 11/20/2022 at 02:39:16 (UTC).

THE APPLICATION OF: THE STATE OF OKLA. EXREL-, CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS

Case Summary

On 06/28/2018 THE APPLICATION OF THE STATE OF OKLA EXREL-, CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS was filed as a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Pottawatomie, Oklahoma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0080

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE STATE OF OKLA. EXREL

Defendant

$546.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

PANTER, ADAM R.

 

Court Documents

FILE NOTICE OF SEIZURE AND FORFEITURE

06/28/2018: FILE NOTICE OF SEIZURE AND FORFEITURE

FILE RETURN OF SERVICE BY PERSONAL DELIVERY TO MALIK

08/15/2018: FILE RETURN OF SERVICE BY PERSONAL DELIVERY TO MALIK

FILE AFFIDAVIT

03/26/2019: FILE AFFIDAVIT

FILE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

03/27/2019: FILE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

FILE CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

03/28/2019: FILE CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

FILE DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

04/10/2019: FILE DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

FILE COURT MINUTE - DISMISSED 4-10-19

04/18/2019: FILE COURT MINUTE - DISMISSED 4-10-19

 

Docket Entries

04/18/2019

HearingEvent: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE COURT MINUTE - DISMISSED 4-10-19

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2019

HearingEvent: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2019

HearingEvent: DISMISSED/SETTLED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2018

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DAVID TATE BY ATTORNEY 8-14-18

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2018
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE RETURN OF SERVICE BY PERSONAL DELIVERY TO MALIK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2018
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE NOTICE OF SEIZURE AND FORFEITURE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less