This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 03/09/2023 at 02:05:02 (UTC).

THE APPLICATION OF: THE STATE OF OKLA. EXREL-, CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS

Case Summary

On 06/27/2018 THE APPLICATION OF THE STATE OF OKLA EXREL-, CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS was filed as a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Pottawatomie, Oklahoma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0077

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE STATE OF OKLA. EXREL

Defendant

$611.00 IN U.S CURRENCY

 

Court Documents

FILE NOTICE OF SEIZURE AND FORFEITURE

06/27/2018: FILE NOTICE OF SEIZURE AND FORFEITURE

FILE RETURN OF SERVICE BY PERSONAL DELIVERY

09/17/2018: FILE RETURN OF SERVICE BY PERSONAL DELIVERY

FILE AFFIDAVIT

03/12/2019: FILE AFFIDAVIT

FILE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

03/27/2019: FILE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

FILE CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

03/28/2019: FILE CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

FILE DEFAULT ORDER OF FORFEITURE

04/18/2019: FILE DEFAULT ORDER OF FORFEITURE

FILE COURT MINUTE - MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT GRANTED

04/18/2019: FILE COURT MINUTE - MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT GRANTED

FILE CERTIFICATE OF MAILNG

11/06/2019: FILE CERTIFICATE OF MAILNG

 

Docket Entries

11/06/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE CERTIFICATE OF MAILNG

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2019

HearingEvent: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2019

HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE COURT MINUTE - MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT GRANTED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE DEFAULT ORDER OF FORFEITURE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/12/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2018
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE RETURN OF SERVICE BY PERSONAL DELIVERY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2018
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE NOTICE OF SEIZURE AND FORFEITURE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less