This case was last updated from Custer County Courts on 01/10/2023 at 04:52:07 (UTC).

THE APPLICATION OF: SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE, ET. AL., CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 THE APPLICATION OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE, , CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS was filed as a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit. This case was filed in Custer County Courts, Custer County Courts located in Seminole, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is WEEDON, JILL C.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0007

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Custer, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

WEEDON, JILL C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BURDGE, JANA

TRUST

HILL, JERRY

SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE

Defendants

ROMANS, ROBERT

TRUSTEES AND ASSIGNS

ADMINISTRATORS, DEVISEES

PRICE, VEDA

AND THE HEIRS, EXECUTORS

IMMEDIATE AND REMOTE OF

ROMANS, PEARL

RIGGLE, MARY K.

PRICE, W.D.

AND

BOTH KNOWN AND UNKNOWN

RIGGLE, ALTON JAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

KING, CARISSA C.

Attorney at CHRISTENSEN LAW GROUP P.L.L.C.

Po Box 821

Clinton, OK 73601

MOORE, ANTHONY S.

Attorney at CHRISTENSEN LAW GROUP PLLC

Po Box 821

Clinton, OK 73601

 

Court Documents

FILE AND ENTER PETITION

02/09/2021: FILE AND ENTER PETITION

AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION FIL & SCANNED

02/09/2021: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION FIL & SCANNED

NOTICE BY PUBLICATION FIL & SCANNED

02/09/2021: NOTICE BY PUBLICATION FIL & SCANNED

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING FIL & SCANNED

02/19/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING FIL & SCANNED

PROOF OF PUBLICATION FIL & SCANNED

03/05/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION FIL & SCANNED

MOTION FOR JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FIL &

03/29/2021: MOTION FOR JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FIL &

JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FIL & SCANNED

03/30/2021: JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FIL & SCANNED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • HearingEvent: MOTION DOCKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • HearingEvent: CIV TRACKING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FIL & SCANNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SCANNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MOTION FOR JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FIL &

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION FIL & SCANNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING FIL & SCANNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE BY PUBLICATION FIL & SCANNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION FIL & SCANNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AND ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 85.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less