This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 06/15/2023 at 05:38:37 (UTC).

THE APPLICATION OF: STATE OF OKLAHOMA, EX REL., CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS

Case Summary

On 10/20/2022 THE APPLICATION OF STATE OF OKLAHOMA, EX REL , CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS was filed as a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Pottawatomie, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0163

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF OKLAHOMA, EX REL.

Defendants

SEVENTY-ONE THOUSAND FIVE HUNDRED

GLOCK 36 WITH SERIAL NO. R692

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ALDERMAN, CHRISTA

 

Court Documents

FILE NOTICE OF SEIZURE & INTENDED FORFEITURE

10/20/2022: FILE NOTICE OF SEIZURE & INTENDED FORFEITURE

FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE- CHRISTA D. ALDERMAN

10/20/2022: FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE- CHRISTA D. ALDERMAN

FILE COURT MINUTE- NOW ON THIS 26TH DAY OF APRIL, 2023

04/26/2023: FILE COURT MINUTE- NOW ON THIS 26TH DAY OF APRIL, 2023

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

05/15/2023: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

FILE PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND BREIF

06/08/2023: FILE PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND BREIF

 

Docket Entries

06/08/2023

HearingEvent: CIVIL DISPOSITION DOCKET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: IN SUPPORT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND BREIF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DOCKET ON JUNE 8, 2023 AT 3:30PM IN COURT ROOM #1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: THE ABOVE MENTIONED CASE IS NOW SET FOT THE DISPOSITION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE COURT MINUTE- NOW ON THIS 26TH DAY OF APRIL, 2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE- CHRISTA D. ALDERMAN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE NOTICE OF SEIZURE & INTENDED FORFEITURE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less